Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0779378

EP0779378 - Process for fabricating wires with brass surfaces for wire electroerosion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHARMILLES TECHNOLOGIES S.A.
8-10, rue du Pré-de-la-Fontaine
1217 Meyrin 1 / CH
[1997/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Briffod, Jean Paul
Les Carelines chez Degradaz
F - 74380 Lucinges / FR
[1997/25]
Representative(s)Micheli & Cie SA
Rue de Genève 122
Case Postale 61
1226 Genève-Thônex / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/49]Micheli & Cie
Rue de Genève 122, Case Postale 61
1226 Genève-Thonex / CH
Former [1997/25]Szilagyi, Marianne
Georg Fischer Management AG Patentabteilung Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
Application number, filing date96119740.710.12.1996
[1997/25]
Priority number, dateCH1995000349111.12.1995         Original published format: CH 349195
[1997/25]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0779378
Date:18.06.1997
Language:FR
[1997/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0779378
Date:01.10.1997
[1997/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0779378
Date:02.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:C23C26/00, B23H7/08
[1997/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/25]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Drähten mit Messing-Oberflächen für Drahtelektroerosion[1997/25]
English:Process for fabricating wires with brass surfaces for wire electroerosion[1997/25]
French:Procédé de fabrication de fils avec une surface de laiton, pour les besoins de l'électro-érosion à fil[1997/25]
Examination procedure10.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/25]
12.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
16.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
30.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.1999Fee for grant paid
24.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.02.2000
FI02.02.2000
GR02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2003/46]AT02.02.2000
FI02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2003/09]AT02.02.2000
FI02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2001/29]AT02.02.2000
FI02.02.2000
IE02.02.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2001/17]AT02.02.2000
IE02.02.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2001/09]AT02.02.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2001/08]AT02.02.2000
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPS61136733  ;
 [Y]JPS61293725  ;
 [A]EP0185492  (FUJIKURA LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 13, line 23 - page 14, line 6 * * page 18, line 20 - page 22, line 4 * * abstract *;
 [A]EP0526361  (TREFIMETAUX [FR]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 14 - line 20 * * page 3, line 34 - line 42 * * page 3, line 58 - page 5, line 11 * * abstract *;
 [A]US4935594  (GROOS HEINRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 35 - line 65 * * abstract *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861112), vol. 010, no. 333, Database accession no. (M - 534), [X] 1,4 * abstract * [Y] 9,10
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870523), vol. 011, no. 160, Database accession no. (M - 592), [Y] 9,10 * abstract *