Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0780248

EP0780248 - Vehicle radial tire [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 05.11.2008  [2008/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
Former [1997/26]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Lesti, Franco
Vicolo del Buco, 9
00153 Roma / IT
02 / Funaro, Italo
Via Casilina km. 33
00036 Valvarino-Palestrina / IT
[1997/26]
Representative(s)Jorio, Paolo , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Jorio, Paolo , et al
STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9
10121 Torino / IT
Former [1997/26]Jorio, Paolo , et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date96120267.817.12.1996
[1997/26]
Priority number, dateIT1995TO0102719.12.1995         Original published format: IT TO951027
[1997/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0780248
Date:25.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0780248
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:B60C15/06
[1997/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/26]
TitleGerman:Radialer Luftreifen[1997/26]
English:Vehicle radial tire[1997/26]
French:Pneumatique radial[1997/26]
Examination procedure11.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/45]
08.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.1999Fee for grant paid
20.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US5117888  (SHIMIZU KUNIHIKO [JP]) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 14; figure 2 *;
 [A]FR2013540  (DUNLOP CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * page 3, line 12 - page 5, line 5; figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2286014  (UNIROYAL AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figure 7 *;
 [A]EP0465188  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 6 *;
 [A]US3406733  (JACQUES BOILEAU) [A] 5 * column W *