Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0780809

EP0780809 - PC-based open metering system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.01.2011
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.03.2011  [2011/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pitney Bowes Inc.
World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road
Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US
[N/P]
Former [2010/12]For all designated states
PITNEY BOWES INC.
World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road
Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US
Former [1997/26]For all designated states
PITNEY BOWES INC.
World Headquarters One Elmcroft
Stamford Connecticut 06926-0700 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Cordery, Robert A.
11 1/2 Jeanette Street
Danbury, CT 06811 / US
02 / Lee, David K.
12 Alpine Street
Monroe, CT 06468 / US
03 / Pauly, Steven J.
10 Surrey Lane
New Milford, CT 06776 / US
04 / Pintsov, Leon A.
10 Governors Row
West Hartford, CT 06117-1900 / US
05 / Riley, David W.
31 Woodland Drive
Easton, CT 06612 / US
06 / Ryan, Frederick W., Jr.
4 Naples Lane
Oxford, CT 06478 / US
07 / Weiant, Monroe A., Jr.
249 Putting Green Road
Trumbull, CT 06611 / US
[1997/26]
Representative(s)Avery, Stephen John , et al
Hoffmann Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/26]Avery, Stephen John , et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date96120519.219.12.1996
[1997/26]
Priority number, dateUS1995057511219.12.1995         Original published format: US 575112
US1995057510919.12.1995         Original published format: US 575109
[1997/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0780809
Date:25.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0780809
Date:01.03.2000
[2000/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0780809
Date:24.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP18.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G07B17/02
[1997/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/26]
TitleGerman:PC-gestütztes offenes Zählsystem und dazugehöriges Verfahren[1997/26]
English:PC-based open metering system and method[1997/26]
French:Procédé et système ouvert de dosage basé sur un ordinateur personnel[1997/26]
Examination procedure29.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
19.09.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2008Fee for grant paid
01.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
Opposition(s)28.12.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 12
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 13
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[DXAY]US4775246  (EDELMANN GEORGE B [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,4,7-9,12-14,19-21,23 * abstract * * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 20 * * column 8, line 38 - column 14, line 10 * * figures 1,2,8-13 * [A] 3,11,15-18 [Y] 5,6,10,24,25,27,29-39;
 [YA]US4941091  (BREAULT MICHELLE S [US], et al) [Y] 24,25,27,29-39 * abstract * * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 7 * * column 4, line 17 - column 5, line 8 * * figure 1 * [A] 1,4,7-9,12-16;
 [Y]US4812994  (TAYLOR MICHAEL P [US], et al) [Y] 10 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *;
 [YA]US4837701  (SANSONE RONALD P [US], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract * * column 4, line 53 - column 6, line 32 * * column 7, line 3 - column 9, line 19 * * figures 1-3,6,7 * [A] 1,10-20,23-25,28-32,36-39;
 [EA]EP0775987  (NEOPOST IND [FR]) [E] 1,2,4,7-9,12-14,19-21,23 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - column 7, line 28 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 15-18
 [YA]  SMITH G S, "EMBEDDED DEVICE DRIVERS SIMPLIFY THE SUPPORT OF UNUSUAL DEVICES UNDER WINDOWS", MICROSOFT SYSTEMS JOURNAL,US,MICROSOFT CO., REDMOND, WA, vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 0889-9932, page 63-83, XP000671762 [Y] 5 * page 1 * * page 4 * [A] 22,26