Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0721972

EP0721972 - Thermoplastic-elastomeric composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 26.08.2015  [2015/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Polimeri Europa S.r.l.
Via Ruggero Settimo 55
90139 Palermo / IT
[1996/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Franco, Raffaele
Via Metauro, 39
I-30173 Mestre (Venezia) / IT
02 / Carraro, Claudio
Via Caltana, 12/1
I-30035 Mirano (Venezia) / IT
03 / Moro, Alessandro
Via Molinella, 37
I-30030 Cazzago di Pianiga (Venezia) / IT
04 / Amico, Antonio
Via De Gasperi, 51
I-22064 Casatenovo (Como) / IT
05 / Princiotta, Gualtiero
Via Alfonsine, 5/6
I-20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT
[1996/29]
Representative(s)Fusina, Gerolamo , et al
Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1996/29]Fusina, Gerolamo , et al
Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10
I-20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date96200023.805.01.1996
[1996/29]
Priority number, dateIT1995MI0002610.01.1995         Original published format: IT MI950026
[1996/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0721972
Date:17.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0721972
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/04
[1996/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/29]
Extension statesSI05.01.1996
TitleGerman:Thermoplastische Elastomerzusammensetzung[1996/29]
English:Thermoplastic-elastomeric composition[1996/29]
French:Composition d'élastomère thermoplastique[1996/29]
Examination procedure07.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/01]
24.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2001Fee for grant paid
25.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.09.2002  27.04.2004  WITHDRAWN
Metzeler Automotive Profile Systems GmbH
Bregenzer Strasse 133
88131 Lindau / DE
Opponent's representative
Preissner, Nicolaus
Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 31 02 03
80102 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/26]
Opponent(s)01  05.09.2002  27.04.2004  WITHDRAWN
Metzeler Automotive Profile Systems GmbH
Bregenzer Strasse 133
88131 Lindau / DE
Opponent's representative
Preissner, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Ing.
Flügel Preissner Kastel Haimhauser Strasse 1
80802 München / DE
Former [2002/50]
Opponent(s)01  05.09.2002  24.10.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Metzeler Automotive Profile Systems GmbH
Bregenzer Strasse 133
88131 Lindau / DE
Opponent's representative
Preissner, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Ing.
Flügel Preissner Kastel Haimhauser Strasse 1
80802 München / DE
Deletion: No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
31.10.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.04.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.07.2004Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
16.09.2004Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Former [2002/49]GR05.12.2001
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0256724  (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * page 7, line 49 - line 54; claim - *;
 [X]EP0164217  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-10 * page 5, line 11 - page 8, line 6; claim - * * page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 5 *;
 [X]GB2195347  (NIPPON OIL CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * page 5, line 44 - line 49; claim - *