EP0789482 - Uniform exposure of photosensitive medium by square intensity profiles for printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XEIKON NV Vredebaan 72 2640 Mortsel / BE | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states XEIKON NV Vredebaan 72 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | |||
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states XEIKON NV Vredebaan 72 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | |||
Former [1997/33] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Broddin, Dirk, c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IIE 3800 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Janssens, Robert, c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IIE 3800 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 03 /
Deschuytere, Frank c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IIE 3800 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 04 /
Nelson, William E., c/o Texas Instruments Inc. 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas, 75265 / US | 05 /
Venkateswar, Vadlammanati, c/o Texas Instr. Inc. 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas, 75265 / US | [1997/33] | Representative(s) | Gambell, Derek, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Gambell, Derek, et al D Gambell & Co, Melbury House, 34 Southborough Road Bickley, Kent BR1 2EB / GB | ||
Former [2000/22] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/09] | Van Ostaeyen, Marc Albert Jozef, et al Agfa-Gevaert N.V., Corporate IP Department, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [1997/33] | Ramon, Charles Lucien, et al Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Dienst Intellectuele Eigendom 3800 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Application number, filing date | 96200308.3 | 09.02.1996 | [1997/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0789482 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0789482 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/04, G02B26/08 | [1997/33] | CPC: |
G03G15/5033 (EP);
H04N1/407 (EP);
G03G2215/00042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/33] | Title | German: | Gleichmässige Belichtung eines lichtempfindlichen Mediums mit quadratischen Intensitätsprofilen für Druckzwecke | [1997/33] | English: | Uniform exposure of photosensitive medium by square intensity profiles for printing | [1997/33] | French: | Exposition uniforme d'un milieu photosensible avec des profils d'intensités au carré pour l'impression | [1997/33] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/28] | 14.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.12.2001 | FR | 19.12.2001 | NL | 19.12.2001 | [2004/35] |
Former [2003/06] | BE | 19.12.2001 | |
NL | 19.12.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3622535 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0621548 (REDIFFUSION SIMULATION LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0620676 (AGFA GEVAERT NV ;TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC (US)) [DA] 1,2,4,7 * column A *; | [A]EP0681263 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC) [A] 1,2,4,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US4378568 (MIR JOSE M) |