Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0790588

EP0790588 - Method of securely storing and retrieving monetary data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.11.2002
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.01.2003  [2003/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke KPN N.V.
Stationsplein 7
9726 AE Groningen / NL
[1998/49]
Former [1997/34]For all designated states
Koninklijke PTT Nederland N.V.
P.O. Box 95321
2509 CH Den Haag / NL
Inventor(s)01 / De Rooij, Peter Jacobus Nicolaas
c/o KPN Research, St. Paulusstraat 4
NL-2264 XZ Leidschendam / NL
02 / Bosselaers, Antoons Wilfried Jan
Naamsestraat 149
3000 Leuven / BE
[1997/34]
Representative(s)Wuyts, Koenraad Maria , et al
Koninklijke KPN N.V.
Intellectual Property Group
P.O. Box 25110
3001 HC Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2001/28]Wuyts, Koenraad Maria , et al
Koninklijke KPN N.V., Intellectual Property Group, P.O. BOX 95321
2509 CH The Hague / NL
Former [1999/14]Klein, Bart
Koninklijke KPN N.V., P.O. Box 95321
2509 CH The Hague / NL
Former [1997/34]Beitsma, Gerhard Romano
Koninklijke PTT Nederland N.V., P.O. Box 95321
2509 CH Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date96200324.012.02.1996
[1997/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0790588
Date:20.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/10
[1997/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/34]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum gesicherten Speichern und Wiederauffinden von monetären Daten[1997/34]
English:Method of securely storing and retrieving monetary data[1997/34]
French:Méthode pour stocker et récupérer en sécurité des données monétaires[1997/34]
Examination procedure20.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/17]
02.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0138219  (TOSHIBA) [A] 1,3,6,7,10 * column A; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0546584  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL) [A] 1,6,8-10 * column A; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9113411  (M. VILLIKARI);
 [A]EP0623903  (PITNEY BOWES);
 [A]WO9110214  (MIKROMAX INDUSTRITEKNIK)