Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0728732

EP0728732 - Process for the carbonylation of butadiene or a butadiene derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/35]For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Agterberg, Frank P.W.
Geldersoverkwartier 9
6118 EH Nieuwstadt / NL
02 / Sielcken, Otto E.
Vliekstraat 4
6136 BG Sittard / NL
03 / D'Amore, Michael B.
2406 Granby Road
Wilmington, Delaware 19810 / US
04 / Bruner Jr., Harold S.
10 Forest Creek Drive
Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US
[1996/35]
Representative(s)Kleiborn, Paul Erik , et al
DSM Intellectual Property
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/42]Kleiborn, Paul Erik , et al
Octrooibureau DSM P.O. Box 9
6160 MA Geleen / NL
Former [1996/35]Cramwinckel, Michiel , et al
DSM N.V., Octrooibureau DSM, P.O. Box 9
6160 MA Geleen / NL
Application number, filing date96200391.916.02.1996
[1996/35]
Priority number, dateUS1995039331322.02.1995         Original published format: US 393313
[1996/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0728732
Date:28.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0728732
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07C67/38, C07C69/533
[1996/35]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/35]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Carbonylieren von Butadien oder eines Butadienderivates[1996/35]
English:Process for the carbonylation of butadiene or a butadiene derivative[1996/35]
French:Procédé de carbonylation du butadiène ou d'un dérivé du butadiène[1996/35]
Examination procedure27.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/13]
25.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2000Fee for grant paid
07.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
03.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0271145  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1,2,4,11 * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 18 * * page 6, line 6 - line 16 * * page 7, line 29 - line 33 * * page 8, line 34 - page 9, line 16 * * page 11 - page 14; examples 1-3,5 * * page 15 - page 18; claim - *;
 [Y]EP0577205  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [Y] 1,2,4,7,8,11 * page 3, line 13 - line 36 * * page 4, line 51 - page 5, line 15 * * page 4 - page 5; examples 1-10 * * page 6 - page 7; claim - *;
 [Y]EP0273489  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [Y] 1,2,4,7,8,11 * page 3, line 17 - line 40 * * page 4, line 32 - line 50 * * page 5, line 11 - line 22 * * page 7; examples 5,7 * * page 8 - page 9; claim - *;
 [D]US5028734  (DRENT EIT [NL])