Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0728412 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0728412



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 989
11.03.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
03.11.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
24.04.2009 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
18.04.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.04.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.04.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.04.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.04.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.04.2009 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 2
07.04.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 17
11.02.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
10.02.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
10.02.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.02.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
05.02.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
05.02.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.01.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
16.01.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
15.01.2009 Claims Appeal 1
15.01.2009 Claims Appeal 3
15.01.2009 Claims Appeal 3
15.01.2009 Claims Appeal 1
15.01.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
15.01.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.01.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
14.01.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
13.01.2009 Claims Appeal 3
13.01.2009 Claims Appeal 3
13.01.2009 Claims Appeal 1
13.01.2009 Claims Appeal 1
13.01.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.01.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
13.11.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
04.11.2008 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
15.09.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
08.09.2008 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
06.09.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.08.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.08.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.08.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.08.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.08.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
19.08.2008 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
14.08.2008 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
17.07.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
17.07.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
14.07.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
11.07.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
12.04.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
02.04.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
30.03.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
13.03.2007 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
12.03.2007 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
09.03.2007 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
09.01.2007 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
08.01.2007 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
05.01.2007 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
05.09.2006 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.09.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.08.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
23.08.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
09.06.2006 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
29.05.2006 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
22.05.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
22.05.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
17.05.2006 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.05.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.05.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.05.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.05.2006 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
06.05.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.04.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.04.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.04.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.04.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.04.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.04.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
18.04.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 16
18.04.2006 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
18.04.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.04.2006 Text intended for grant Opposition 13
10.02.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.02.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.10.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.09.2005 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 5
22.09.2005 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 6
16.09.2005 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 3
13.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.09.2005 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2005 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2005 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
19.08.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.07.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 13
15.07.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
15.07.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 10
15.07.2005 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
15.07.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
15.07.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
15.07.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
15.07.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
15.07.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
15.07.2005 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.07.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.07.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.07.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.06.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.06.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.06.2005 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.06.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.06.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.01.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.01.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.12.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.12.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.12.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.12.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.12.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 3
21.12.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.12.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.12.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.12.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.12.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.12.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.12.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.12.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.12.2004 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.12.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
15.12.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.12.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
30.11.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.11.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.11.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
22.11.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.11.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.11.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.11.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.11.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.11.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.11.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.07.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.07.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.07.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.07.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.07.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.07.2004 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2004 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.07.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.07.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.07.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.07.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.07.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.06.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
29.06.2004 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
29.06.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.06.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 3
06.04.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
02.04.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.04.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.03.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
15.12.2003 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
28.11.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.11.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.11.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
18.11.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
30.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.10.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
14.10.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.10.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
09.10.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
24.07.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.07.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.07.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
17.07.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.07.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.04.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
16.04.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.04.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.03.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.03.2003 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
13.03.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.03.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.03.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
11.03.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
11.03.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
11.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
11.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
11.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
11.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
11.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
07.03.2003 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
07.03.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
07.03.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
07.03.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
07.03.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
07.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
07.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
07.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
07.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
07.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
07.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
07.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
07.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
06.03.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.03.2003 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
05.03.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.03.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
05.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.02.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
25.04.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.02.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.02.2002 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
19.02.2002 Translation of priority document Search / examination 25
19.02.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
19.02.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
07.12.2001 Filing of a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
07.12.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
01.12.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.08.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.08.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.08.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
07.06.2001 Claims Search / examination 4
07.06.2001 Description Search / examination 1
07.06.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.05.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.04.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.01.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
03.04.2000 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
18.03.2000 Claims Search / examination 6
18.03.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.02.2000 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
02.11.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.10.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.10.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.06.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
13.10.1998 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.06.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.06.1996 European search report Search / examination 2
04.06.1996 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
13.03.1996 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
13.03.1996 Priority document Search / examination 28
22.02.1996 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.02.1996 Claims Search / examination 5
22.02.1996 Description Search / examination 12
22.02.1996 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.1996 Drawings Search / examination 7
22.02.1996 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
22.02.1996 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6