Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0735639

EP0735639 - Elastic sleeve support [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.09.2009  [2009/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PIRELLI CAVI E SISTEMI S.p.A.
Viale Sarca, 222
20126 Milano / IT
[1998/09]
Former [1996/40]For all designated states
PIRELLI CAVI S.p.A.
Viale Sarca, 222
20126 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Portas, Francesco
Via Roma, 4
15028 Quattordio (Alessandria) / IT
02 / Vallauri, Ubaldo
Via Rovani, 6
20052 Monza (Milano) / IT
[1996/40]
Representative(s)Checcacci, Giorgio , et al
Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A.
Via Trebbia 20
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/38]Checcacci, Giorgio , et al
Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia 20
20135 Milano / IT
Former [1998/09]Checcacci, Giorgio , et al
PORTA, CHECCACCI & BOTTI s.r.l. Viale Sabotino, 19/2
20135 Milano / IT
Former [1996/40]Checcacci, Giorgio
PORTA, CHECCACCI & BOTTI s.r.l. Viale Sabotino, 19/2
I-20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date96200770.422.03.1996
[1996/40]
Priority number, dateIT1995MI0060627.03.1995         Original published format: IT MI950606
[1996/40]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0735639
Date:02.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0735639
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:H02G15/18, B29C53/58
[1996/40]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/40]
TitleGerman:Stützteil für eine elastische Muffe[1996/40]
English:Elastic sleeve support[1996/40]
French:Organe support pour un manchon élastique[1996/40]
Examination procedure24.03.1997Examination requested  [1997/24]
17.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2000Fee for grant paid
06.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US4389440  (KEITH ROGER H) [A] 1-4,12 * column 3, line 11 - line 31 *;
 [A]EP0500216  (ATCOFLEX INC [US]) [A] 1-4,12 * column 4, line 25 - line 53 * * figure - *;
 [A]US2661025  (BRACE GEORGE A) [A] 12-15 * column 3, line 8 - column 5, line 18 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE1450348  (HAWERKAMP MANFRED) [A] 12-15 * page 5 - page 7; figure - *;
 [A]GB2184193  (KANAO SHIRO) [A] 12,13 * abstract *