Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0747260

EP0747260 - Cupholder for confined space [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Manchester Plastics Inc.
201 W. Big Beaver, Suite 1040 Troy
Michigan 48084 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/50]For all designated states
Manchester Plastics Inc.
201 W. Big Beaver, Suite 1040
Troy, Michigan 48084 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Baniak, Grzegorz H.
2 Chelsea Drive
Etobicoke, Ontario M8W R6 / CA
[1996/50]
Representative(s)Wharton, Peter Robert
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/50]Wharton, Peter Robert
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Inventions House Valley Court, Canal Road
Bradford BD1 4SP / GB
Application number, filing date96200981.709.04.1996
[1996/50]
Priority number, dateUS1995047965207.06.1995         Original published format: US 479652
[1996/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0747260
Date:11.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0747260
Date:10.06.1998
[1998/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0747260
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60N3/10
[1996/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/50]
TitleGerman:Becherhalter für einen geschlossenen Raum[1996/50]
English:Cupholder for confined space[1996/50]
French:Porte-gobelet pour un espace confiné[1996/50]
Examination procedure23.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/03]
28.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2003Fee for grant paid
14.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4733908  (DYKSTRA RONALD A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11 * column 2, line 41 - column 4, line 4; figures 1-6 * [A] 6-8;
 [XA]US4728018  (PARKER BARRY R [US]) [X] 1-4 * column W * [A] 5,8,11;
 [A]EP0447263  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1-5,11 * abstract *;
 [AD]US4907775  (LORENCE BRIAN S [US], et al) [AD] 1-11 * column W *