Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0741333

EP0741333 - Photopolymerizable compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  25.05.2007
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AGFA CORPORATION
100 Challenger Road
Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660-2199 / US
[2007/26]
Former [1999/31]For all designated states
Agfa Corporation
100 Challenger Road
Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660-2199 / US
Former [1999/24]For all designated states
AGFA CORPORATION
200 Ballardvale Street
Wilmington, MA 01887 / US
Former [1996/45]For all designated states
Bayer Corporation
One Mellon Center 500 Grant Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2502 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wilczak, Wojciech A.
205 10th Street, Apt. 4L
Jersey City, New Jersey 07302 / US
[1996/45]
Representative(s)De Niel, Marc Alfons Jozef
Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Corporate Intellectual Property Department 3800 Patent Administration Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
[N/P]
Former [2004/40]De Niel, Marc Alfons Jozef
Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Corporate Intellectual Property Department 3800 Patent Administration Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
Former [2000/11]Van Ostaeyen, Marc Albert Jozef , et al
Agfa-Gevaert N.V., Corporate IP Department, Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
Former [1996/45]Ramon, Charles Lucien , et al
Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Dienst Intellectuele Eigendom 3800 Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
Application number, filing date96201158.127.04.1996
[1996/45]
Priority number, dateUS1995043556005.05.1995         Original published format: US 435560
[1996/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0741333
Date:06.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0741333
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0741333
Date:27.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/029, G03F3/10
[1996/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/45]
TitleGerman:Fotopolymerisierbare Zusammensetzungen[1996/45]
English:Photopolymerizable compositions[1996/45]
French:Compositions photopolymérisables[1996/45]
Examination procedure06.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/27]
28.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2000Fee for grant paid
07.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.03.2001   
3M ESPE AG
Espe Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
 [2001/21]
07.08.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.02.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.04.2005Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.04.2005Date of oral proceedings
21.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
21.04.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.06.2005Reply to a communication from the opposition division
20.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
19.09.2006Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.02.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
17.04.2007Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT12.07.2000
NL12.07.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2003/09]NL12.07.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0412495  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-28 * page 11; table 1 * * page 7, line 48 - line 54 *;
 [A]EP0446175  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-28 * page 7; example 1; claim - *;
 [A]EP0298030  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-28 * column 14; example 9 * * column 15; example 13 *;
 [AD]US5300399  (WILCZAK WOJCIECH A [US]) [AD] 1-28 * column 6, line 40 - line 44 *
ExaminationEP0413657
 DE4231579
 DE2243182
 US3060023
    Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, 5th edit., 1991, vol. A18, pp. 153-177,
    ROMPP Lexikon Chemie, 10th edit., vol. 4, 1998, pp. 3028-3029,