Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0748608

EP0748608 - Dynamic system of survey and selection of treatments of cellulite [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 18.04.2007  [2007/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
I.P.S., INTERNATIONAL PRODUCTS & SERVICES S.R.L.
6, Via Civesio
I-20097 San Donato Milanese(Milano) / IT
[1996/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Marzorati, Vittorio
38, Via Don Minzoni
20091 Bresso, Milano / IT
[1996/51]
Representative(s)Riccardi, Sergio
Riccardi & Co.
Via Macedonio Melloni, 32
20129 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1996/51]Riccardi, Sergio
Riccardi & Co. Via Macedonio Melloni, 32
20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date96201357.918.05.1996
[1996/51]
Priority number, dateIT1995MI0128015.06.1995         Original published format: IT MI951280
[1996/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0748608
Date:18.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0748608
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00
[1996/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/51]
TitleGerman:Dynamisches Untersuchungssystem und Behandlungsauswahl der Zellulitis[1996/51]
English:Dynamic system of survey and selection of treatments of cellulite[1996/51]
French:Système dynamique de sondage et sélection de traitement de la cellulite[1996/51]
Examination procedure11.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/34]
27.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.2002Fee for grant paid
28.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
DK20.02.2003
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
LU18.05.2003
IE19.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
[2007/16]
Former [2005/02]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
LU18.05.2003
IE19.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
Former [2004/39]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
LU18.05.2003
IE19.05.2003
Former [2004/29]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
IE19.05.2003
Former [2003/51]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/43]AT20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/39]AT20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/37]AT20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/31]GR20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/30]NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE20.02.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US4217373  (JENNEN FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 7 - line 58; table 1 *;
 [A]US3830224  (VANZETTI R, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 9 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 30; table 1 *;
 [A]GB2086575  (COLOMBO ALDO) [A] 1 * page 1, line 72 - line 83 * * page 3, line 79 - line 89; table 1 *