Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0747301 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0747301



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 563
03.07.2008 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
02.08.2006 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 18
01.08.2006 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
03.07.2006 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
23.06.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.06.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
21.06.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.06.2006 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 2
01.06.2006 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
01.06.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.05.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 35
26.05.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 35
28.03.2006 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 9
27.03.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.03.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
23.03.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
17.03.2006 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
14.03.2006 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.03.2006 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
16.08.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.08.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
17.03.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.03.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
07.03.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
27.10.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
19.10.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
19.10.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
19.10.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
19.10.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
19.10.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
19.10.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.10.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 42
10.08.2004 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
04.08.2004 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
03.08.2004 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
19.05.2004 Refund order of filing/examination fee Appeal 1
21.04.2004 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.04.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
13.04.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
08.04.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
09.03.2004 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
05.03.2004 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.03.2004 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
27.01.2004 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
23.01.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
22.01.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
11.12.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.12.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.12.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.12.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.12.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 7
02.12.2003 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
02.12.2003 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
02.12.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 4
02.12.2003 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.11.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.11.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.11.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
03.11.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 6
23.10.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 2
23.10.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 2
17.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 11
17.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.03.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.03.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.03.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.03.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
18.03.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
18.03.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
04.03.2003 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.11.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.10.2002 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
24.10.2002 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
14.06.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.06.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
31.05.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.05.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.05.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.05.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.05.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.05.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 12
13.05.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.05.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.05.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
13.05.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
13.05.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
08.05.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
08.05.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
28.06.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.06.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
12.06.2001 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
08.06.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
08.06.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
08.06.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
08.06.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.06.2001 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.06.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 6
07.06.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
30.05.2001 Claims Search / examination 1
30.05.2001 Description Search / examination 2
30.05.2001 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.05.2001 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
30.03.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.03.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.03.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 11
06.02.2001 General enquiry Search / examination 1
05.02.2001 Request for accelerated examination Search / examination 1
22.09.2000 Request for accelerated examination Search / examination 1
26.06.2000 Drawings Search / examination 6
26.06.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
29.03.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.03.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
21.03.2000 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.03.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.03.2000 Request for assignment Search / examination 5
15.12.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.06.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
06.05.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.04.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.02.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.12.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
16.11.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.11.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.09.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.07.1998 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
30.07.1998 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
20.07.1998 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
21.04.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.12.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.12.1996 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.12.1996 Priority document Search / examination 11
02.12.1996 Translation of priority document Search / examination 11
06.11.1996 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
19.09.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.09.1996 European search report Search / examination 2
09.07.1996 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.07.1996 Claims Search / examination 1
09.07.1996 Description Search / examination 10
09.07.1996 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.06.1996 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.06.1996 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
10.06.1996 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
10.06.1996 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 12