blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0741316

EP0741316 - Optical pulse generator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.07.2001 [2001/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3-2, Nishishinjuku Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo-to / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/45]For all designated states
KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3-2, Nishishinjuku
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Suzuki, Masatoshi
1-6-5 Hachiman
Kasashima-Machi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Tanaka, Hideaki
5-8-14 Hon-Cho
Koganei-Shi, Tokyo-To / JP
03 / Matsushima, Yuichi
1-2430-23 Hanazono
Tokorozawa-Shi / JP
[1996/45]
Representative(s)Crawford, Fiona Merle, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/45]Crawford, Fiona Merle, et al
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date96201982.403.02.1993
[1996/45]
Priority number, dateJP1992004639003.02.1992         Original published format: JP 4639092
JP1992012935323.04.1992         Original published format: JP 12935392
[1996/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0741316
Date:06.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0741316
Date:09.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.09.1996
ClassificationIPC:G02F1/015, G02F1/025, H04B10/18, H01S5/02
[2000/14]
CPC:
B82Y20/00 (EP); G02F1/0121 (EP); G02F1/015 (EP);
G02F1/025 (EP); H01S5/0261 (EP); H01S5/0265 (EP);
H04B10/25077 (EP); G02F1/0157 (EP); G02F1/01708 (EP);
G02F2203/26 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [1996/45]G02F1/015, G02F1/025, H04B10/18, H01S3/025
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/45]
TitleGerman:Optischer Impulsgeber[1996/45]
English:Optical pulse generator[1996/45]
French:Générateur d'impulsions optiques[1996/45]
Examination procedure31.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/45]
07.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.02.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2000Fee for grant paid
05.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93300773.4  / EP0556974
Opposition(s)10.05.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
10.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS61143721  ;
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861118), vol. 010, no. 341, Database accession no. (P - 517), & JP61143721 A 19860701 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *
 [A]  - TANAKA H ET AL, "5-Gb/s performance of integrated light source consisting of lambda /4-shifted DFB laser and EA modulator with SI InP BH structure", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, SEPT. 1990, USA, ISSN 0733-8724, vol. 8, no. 9, pages 1357 - 1362, XP000174424 [A] 1,3,6-8 * abstract; sections I-IV; figures 1,2,7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.59165
 [T]  - TANAKA H ET AL, "Optical short pulse generation and data modulation by a single-chip InGaAsP tandem-integrated electroabsorption modulator (TEAM)", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, 27 MAY 1993, UK, ISSN 0013-5194, vol. 29, no. 11, pages 1002 - 1004, XP000372924 [T] * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.