Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0766920

EP0766920 - Apparatus for temporarily storing product holders [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/15]Apparatus for temporarily storing product holders and support element for use in such an apparatus
[2000/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.05.2002  [2002/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kaak, Johan Hendrik Bernard
Rijksweg 273
7011 DZ Gaanderen / NL
[2000/50]
Former [1997/15]For all designated states
Kaak, Johan Hendrik Bernard
Rijksweg 273
NL-7011 DZ Gaanderen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Pasch, Lothar
Pr. Johan Frisohof 34
7061 WV Terborg / NL
[1997/15]
Representative(s)Ferguson, Alexander , et al
Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V.
P.O. Box 266
2501 AW Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Ferguson, Alexander , et al
Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade, P.O. Box 266
2501 AW Den Haag / NL
Former [1997/15]Seerden, Adrianus Maria
Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade P.O. Box 266
2501 AW Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date96202732.203.10.1996
[1997/15]
Priority number, dateNL1995100134204.10.1995         Original published format: NL 1001342
[1997/15]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0766920
Date:09.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0766920
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:A21C13/02, A21B3/07
[1997/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/15]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung für zeitliche Lagerung von Produktträgern[2000/33]
English:Apparatus for temporarily storing product holders[2000/33]
French:Appareil pour le stockage temporaire des porteurs de produit[2000/33]
Former [1997/15]Vorrichtung für zeitliche Lagerung von Produktträgern und Abstützelement für eine solche Vorrichtung
Former [1997/15]Apparatus for temporarily storing product holders and support element for use in such an apparatus
Former [1997/15]Appareil pour le stockage temporaire des porteurs de produit et élément de soutien pour un tel appareil
Examination procedure06.10.1997Examination requested  [1997/49]
13.09.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2001Fee for grant paid
07.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0620973  (D F M PRODUCTS [NL]) [X] 1-8 * column 9, line 20 - line 45; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0565098  (SOREMARTEC SA [BE]) [A] 1-8 * column A; figure - *