blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0768538

EP0768538 - Method and tester for applying a pulse trigger to a unit to be triggered [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/16]Method, tester and circuit for applying a pulse trigger to a unit to be triggered
[1998/50]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  29.08.2014
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2014Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 01.10.2014  [2014/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JTAG Technologies B.V.
Boschdijk 50
5602 AN Eindhoven / NL
[2014/40]
Former [1997/16]For all designated states
Jtag Technologies B.V.
Boschdijk 50
5602 AN Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / De Wit, Hendrikus, c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / Stork, Cornelis F.J.M., c/o Int.Octrooibureau B.V.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2014/40]
Former [1997/16]01 / De Wit, Hendrikus, c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / Stork, Cornelis F.J.M., c/o Int.Octrooibureau B.V.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Representative(s)Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V.
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
[2013/44]
Former [2013/41]Dohmen, Johannes Maria Gerardus, et al
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V.
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Former [2009/49]Van kan, Johan Joseph Hubert, et al
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Former [2001/24]Van kan, Johan Joseph Hubert, Ir., et al
Algemeen Octrooibureau, World Trade Centre, P. Petersstraat 160
5612 LV Eindhoven / NL
Former [1997/16]Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria, et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date96202805.609.10.1996
[1997/16]
Priority number, dateEP1995020275813.10.1995         Original published format: EP 95202758
[1997/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0768538
Date:16.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0768538
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0768538
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.1997
ClassificationIPC:G01R31/3185, G06F11/267, G11C29/00
[1997/16]
CPC:
G01R31/318555 (EP); G01R31/318547 (EP); G11C29/32 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/16]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Tester zur Beaufschlagung eines elektronischen Bausteins mit einem Triggerimpuls[1999/10]
English:Method and tester for applying a pulse trigger to a unit to be triggered[1998/50]
French:Procédé et testeur pour la délivrance des implusions de déclenchement à une unité[2009/03]
Former [1997/16]Verfahren, Prüfer und Schaltung zur Triggerimpulsbeauftragung einer Einrichtung
Former [1997/16]Method, tester and circuit for applying a pulse trigger to a unit to be triggered
Former [1997/16]Procédé, testeur et circuit pour la délivrance des implusions de déclenchement à une unité
Examination procedure29.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/48]
29.09.1997Request for accelerated examination filed
16.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.1998Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
04.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.1999Fee for grant paid
20.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.10.2000  14.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Firma Göpel electronic GmbH
Göschwitzer Str. 58/60
07745 Jena / DE
Opponent's representative
Boon, Stephan E.
Müller Boon Dersch Rechtsanwälte Schlossgasse 3-4
D-07743 Jena / DE
 [2004/24]
Former [2002/24]
Opponent(s)01  11.10.2000  14.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Firma Göpel electronic GmbH
Göschwitzer Str. 58/60
07745 Jena / DE
Opponent's representative
Boon, Stephan E.
Müller Boon Dersch Rechtsanwälte Göschwitzer Strasse 22
07745 Jena / DE
Former [2000/50]
Opponent(s)01  11.10.2000  14.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Firma Göpel electronic GmbH
Göschwitzer Str. 58/60
07745 Jena / DE
Opponent's representative
Pfeiffer, Rolf-Gerd, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwaltsbüro Pfeiffer & Partner Winzerlaer Strasse 10
07745 Jena / DE
17.11.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.05.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.12.2002Date of oral proceedings
17.01.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.09.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.10.2006Date of oral proceedings
12.11.2007Date of oral proceedings
18.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
18.12.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.02.2008Reply to a communication from the opposition division
13.10.2008Date of oral proceedings
05.12.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.10.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.10.2013Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.05.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
22.08.2014Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition13.02.2009Appeal received No.  T0448/09
15.04.2009Statement of grounds filed
18.10.2011Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
20.03.2003Appeal received No.  T0373/03
20.05.2003Statement of grounds filed
02.09.2005Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
18.10.2011Date of oral proceedings
02.09.2005Date of oral proceedings
13.09.2005Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
02.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0402134  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC.) [A] 1,5,8 * abstract * * column 6, line 43 - line 57 * * column 13, line 56 - column 15, line 22 *;
 [A]US5448575  (HASHIZUME) [A] 1,5,8 * column 15, line 14 - line 26 * * abstract *;
 [A]JPH06160489
 [A]  - COLEMAN J. ET AL., "Boundary Scan speeds static memory tests", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, CLEVELAND, OH, (199302), vol. 41, no. 4, pages 61 - 73, XP000349033 [A] 1,5,8 * page 61, line 39 - page 62, column 1, line 8 * * page 66, column 1, line 14 - column 3, line 2; figures 2,3 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 18, no. 478, Database accession no. (P - 1796), & JP06160489 A 19940706 (HITACHI LTD.) [A] 1,5,8 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.