Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0773189

EP0773189 - Process for the preparation of hydroxylammonium salts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.03.2001 [2001/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[N/P]
Former [1997/20]For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Van Lieshout, Lambertus Hubertus Wilhelmus Maria
Groot Berghem 11
6235 BK Meerssen / NL
02 / Schevelier, Peter Arnold Ceciliaan
Stategaard 21
6227 GK Maastricht / NL
03 / Lefferts, Leonardus
Hugo de Grootstraat 5
6181 BG Stein / NL
[1997/20]
Application number, filing date96203007.829.10.1996
[1997/20]
Priority number, dateBE1995000093610.11.1995         Original published format: BE 9500936
[1997/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0773189
Date:14.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0773189
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP18.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:C01B21/14, B01J23/44
[1997/20]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   NL [1997/20]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hydroxylammoniumsalzen[1997/20]
English:Process for the preparation of hydroxylammonium salts[1997/20]
French:Procédé de production des sels d'hydroxylammoniums[1997/20]
Examination procedure13.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/46]
29.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.1999Fee for grant paid
22.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2231440  (STAMICARBON) [X] 1-8 * page 6; claim - *;
 [A]NL7902291  (STAMICARBON) [A] 4-6 * example II; claim - *;
 [A]US4832938  (GOSSER LAWRENCE W [US], et al) [A] 5 * claim 2 *;
 [A]FR2285340  (STAMICARBON [NL]) [A] 7 * column W *
 [A]  NAOKI TOSHIMA ET AL, "POLYMER-PROTECTED PALLADIUM-PLATINUM BIMETALLIC CLUSTERS: PREPARATION, CATALYTIC PROPERTIES AND STRUCTURAL CONSIDERATIONS", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY. FARADAY TRANSACTIONS, (19930721), vol. 89, no. 14, pages 2537 - 2543, XP000381461 [A] 1-4,6 * page 2538, column R - page 2540, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/ft9938902537
Examination   Johnson Matthey (Materials Technology Division-Chemicals): Summary of standard catalysts and typical applications (Palladium),,
    Degussa Chemical Catalysts: Application Data Sheet.,