Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0788761

EP0788761 - An apparatus for processing a base with a rotating member [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Change - applicantpublished on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For:CH  DE  DK  ES  FR  LI  NL  SE 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
Blackfriars
London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]For:CH  DE  DK  ES  FR  LI  NL  SE 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars London
EC4P 4BQ / GB
Former [2000/20]For:CH  DE  DK  ES  FR  LI  NL  SE 
UNILEVER N.V.
P.O. Box 760
3000 DK Rotterdam / NL
For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Former [1997/33]For:CH  DE  DK  ES  FR  LI  NL  SE 
UNILEVER N.V.
P.O. Box 760
NL-3000 DK Rotterdam / NL
For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Windmeisser, Dieter
c/o Diversey Lever
CH-9542 Munchwilen (TG) / CH
[1997/33]
Representative(s)Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M. , et al
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
[N/P]
Former [1997/33]Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M. , et al
Unilever N.V., Patent Division, P.O. Box 137
3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL
Application number, filing date96203638.019.12.1996
[1997/33]
Priority number, dateEP1996020028909.02.1996         Original published format: EP 96200289
[1997/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0788761
Date:13.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0788761
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:A47L11/162, A47L11/40
[1997/33]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL,   SE [1997/33]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Bearbeiten einer Fläche mit einem rotierenden Element[1997/33]
English:An apparatus for processing a base with a rotating member[1997/33]
French:Appareil pour traiter une surface au moyen d'un organe rotatif[1997/33]
Examination procedure03.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/44]
22.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.1999Fee for grant paid
29.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
[2003/46]
Former [2001/27]SE17.08.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4413795  (DIETHELM & CO [CH]) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 42 - column 7, line 1; figures 3-6,8-10 *;
 [X]EP0073725  (PLAZANET MAURICE P) [X] 1-6 * page 5, line 5 - line 15; figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0640314  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1 * column A *