Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0768057

EP0768057 - Decorative window for dispensers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.06.2001 [2001/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Former [1997/52]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Former [1997/48]For all designated states
Kimberley-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
401 North Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Former [1997/16]For all designated states
SCOTT PAPER COMPANY
Industrial Highway Tinicum Island Road Tinicum Township
Delaware County, PA 19113 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bytell, Joseph
2311 Hall Road
Hartford, Wisconsin 53027 / US
02 / Sigmund, Jerry A.
3721 Paseo Vista, Famoso Rancho
Santa Fe CA 92091 / US
[1997/30]
Former [1997/16]01 / Bytell, Joseph
2311 Hall Road
Hartford, Wisconsin 53027 / US
02 / Sigmund, Jerry A.
333 Wister Road
Wynnewood, Pennsylvania 19096 / US
Representative(s)WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/16]W.P. Thompson & Co.
Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date96203703.230.09.1993
[1997/16]
Priority number, dateUS1992095957413.10.1992         Original published format: US 959574
[1997/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0768057
Date:16.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0768057
Date:23.07.1997
[1997/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0768057
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:A47K5/12, A47K10/34
[1997/16]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   PT [1997/16]
TitleGerman:Dekoratives Fenster für Spender[1997/16]
English:Decorative window for dispensers[1997/16]
French:Fenêtre décorative pour des distributeurs[1997/16]
Examination procedure27.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/16]
24.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
27.12.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
19.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2000Fee for grant paid
07.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93307794.3  / EP0593182
Opposition(s)13.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
04.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4915316  (BASTIAN LEHYMAN J [US]) [AD] 1,9,16,17,19 * column W *;
 [A]US4789073  (FINE NEIL H [US]) [A] 1,9,16,17,19 * column W *;
 [A]EP0116812  (CWS AG [CH]) [A] 1,9,16,17,19 * abstract *
by applicantUS4915316
 US19920922445