Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0757967

EP0757967 - Load control device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DE, IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RUD-Kettenfabrik Rieger & Dietz GmbH u. Co.
Friedensinsel
73432 Aalen-Unterkochen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
RUD-KETTENFABRIK RIEGER & DIETZ GMBH U. CO.
Friedensinsel 1
73432 Aalen-Unterkochen / DE
Former [1997/07]For all designated states
RUD-KETTENFABRIK RIEGER & DIETZ GMBH U. CO.
Friedensinsel 1
D-73432 Aalen-Unterkochen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wolter, Frank-Dietrich
Glückaufstr. 4
73433 Aalen / DE
[1997/07]
Representative(s)Böning, Manfred
Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Böning, Manfred, Prof.Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Leistikowstrasse 2
14050 Berlin / DE
Former [1998/18]Böning, Manfred, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwalt, Leistikowstrasse 2
14050 Berlin / DE
Former [1997/07]Böning, Manfred, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Dieter Jander Dr.-Ing. Manfred Böning Leistikowstrasse 2
14050 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date96250164.931.07.1996
[1997/07]
Priority number, dateDE199513068708.08.1995         Original published format: DE 19530687
[1997/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0757967
Date:12.02.1997
Language:DE
[1997/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0757967
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:B66C1/12, G01L5/04
[1997/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1997/07]
TitleGerman:Lastkontrolleinrichtung[1997/07]
English:Load control device[1997/07]
French:Dispositif de contrôle de la charge[1997/07]
Examination procedure15.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/29]
04.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.1999Fee for grant paid
28.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR26.01.2000
GB26.01.2000
IT26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
AT31.07.2000
DE31.07.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]FR26.01.2000
GB26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
AT31.07.2000
Former [2002/23]GB26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
FR23.06.2000
AT31.07.2000
Former [2002/14]GB26.01.2000
FR23.06.2000
AT31.07.2000
Former [2001/12]GB26.01.2000
FR23.06.2000
Former [2001/09]FR23.06.2000
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE3739100  (STEIRISCHE KETTENFABRIKEN) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2055253  (RUD-KETTENFABRIK RIEGEL & DIETZ);
 [A]DE3421844  (MANNESMANN);
 [A]CH341662  (VIBRO-METER);
 [A]GB532772  (AUSTIN);
 [A]FR2229962  (DUD-KETTENFABRIK RIEGER & DIETZ)