Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0762335

EP0762335 - Method for changing data charged in memory cells of an electronic franking machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Francotyp-Postalia AG & Co. KG
Triftweg 21-26
16547 Birkenwerder / DE
[2002/28]
Former [1997/11]For all designated states
Francotyp-Postalia Aktiengesellschaft & Co.
Triftweg 21-26
16547 Birkenwerder / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Pilz, Joachim
Einemstr. 4
10787 Berlin / DE
02 / Zarges, Olav A.
Triftstrasse 61
13353 Berlin / DE
[1997/11]
Application number, filing date96250187.030.08.1996
[1997/11]
Priority number, dateDE199513452808.09.1995         Original published format: DE 19534528
[1997/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0762335
Date:12.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0762335
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0762335
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G07B17/02
[1997/11]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1997/11]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Veränderung der in Speicherzellen geladenen Daten einer elektronischen Frankiermaschine[1997/11]
English:Method for changing data charged in memory cells of an electronic franking machine[1997/11]
French:Procédé pour changer les données chargées dans des cellules de stockage d'une machine d'affranchissement[1997/11]
Examination procedure03.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
08.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2002Fee for grant paid
13.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
15.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0457940  (HEWLETT PACKARD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,9,10 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 49 * * column 5, line 23 - line 54 * * column 6, line 34 - line 50 *;
 [A]EP0619565  (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1,9 * column 4, line 15 - line 40 * * column 18, line 21 - line 28 * * figure 8; claims 1,2,5,7,8 *;
 [A]US4757532  (GILHAM DENNIS T [GB]) [A] 1,9 * figures 1,3; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0137737  (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 9 * page 2, line 21 - page 4, line 30 *