Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0783902

EP0783902 - Extracorporal control device for an implantable medical device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.09.2006
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.10.2006  [2006/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOTRONIK Mess- und Therapiegeräte GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin
Woermannkehre 1
12359 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/43]For all designated states
BIOTRONIK Mess- und Therapiegeräte GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin
Woermannkehre 1
12359 Berlin / DE
Former [1997/29]For all designated states
BIOTRONIK Mess- und Therapiegeräte GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin
Woermannkehre 1
D-12359 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dietrich, Michael
Görrestrasse 24
12161 Berlin / DE
[1997/29]
Representative(s)von Oppen, Joachim F.M.
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR
Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/01]von Oppen, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing.
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2
10178 Berlin / DE
Former [1997/29]Christiansen, Henning, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Pacelliallee 43/45
14195 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date96250292.817.12.1996
[1997/29]
Priority number, dateDE199514865818.12.1995         Original published format: DE 19548658
[1997/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0783902
Date:16.07.1997
Language:DE
[1997/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0783902
Date:07.10.1998
[1998/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0783902
Date:26.10.2005
Language:DE
[2005/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/372
[1997/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1997/29]
TitleGerman:Extrakorporales Kontrollgerät für ein implantierbares medizinisches Gerät[1997/29]
English:Extracorporal control device for an implantable medical device[1997/29]
French:Dispositif de contrôle extracorporel pour un dispositif médical implantable[1997/29]
Examination procedure18.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/16]
12.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.2005Fee for grant paid
26.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[AD]US5421830  (EPSTEIN ANDREW E [US], et al) [AD] 1,3,4,7-9 * column 3, line 22 - column 9, line 55; figure - *;
 [A]DE3440615  (INST RUNDFUNKTECHNIK GMBH) [A] 1,2,4-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5113869  (NAPPHOLZ TIBOR A [US], et al) [A] 1,5,7,9 * column 12, lines 27-44 * * column 18, line 10 - column 20, line 18; figures 10-12,14 *;
 [A]US5357969  (HERLEIKSON EARL C [US]) [A] 5,6 * column W *;
 [A]DE4417927  (BIOTRONIK MESS & THERAPIEG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 5; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US4862449  (HOEFKENS DANIEL S G [BE], et al) [A] 2-6,8 * column A * * column 5, line 37 - column 8, line 45 *
by applicantDE2545802
 EP0012709
 DE295995
 DE3701947
 US5421830