Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0721138

EP0721138 - Pixel elements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.04.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.04.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.05.2001 [2001/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square Rochester
New York 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/23]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Former [1996/28]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square
Rochester New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Jackson, Warren B.
160 Castenada Avenue
San Francisco, California 94116-1407 / US
02 / Biegelsen, David K.
200 Mimosa Way
Portola Valley, California 94028 / US
03 / Jared, David A.
707 Continental Circle No. 156
Mountain View, California 94040 / US
04 / Weisfield, Richard L.
11520 Old Ranch Road
Los Altos, California 94024 / US
[1996/42]
Former [1996/28]01 / Jackson, Warren B.
160 Castenada Avenue
San Francisco, California 94116-1407 / US
02 / Biegelsen, David K.
200 Mimosa Way
Portola Valley, California 94028 / US
03 / Jared, David A.
707 Continental Circle No. 516
Mountain View, California 94040 / US
04 / Weisfield, Richard L.
11520 Old Ranch Road
Los Altos, California 94024 / US
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/21]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [1996/28]Johnson, Reginald George , et al
Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB
Application number, filing date96300066.603.01.1996
[1996/28]
Priority number, dateUS1995036813103.01.1995         Original published format: US 368131
[1996/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0721138
Date:10.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0721138
Date:02.01.1997
[1997/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0721138
Date:07.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/1343
[1996/28]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/28]
TitleGerman:Bildelemente[1996/28]
English:Pixel elements[1996/28]
French:Eléments d'image[1996/28]
Examination procedure02.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/36]
12.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.1999Fee for grant paid
19.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4139278  (MATSUMOTO SEIICHI, et al) [X] 1-6 * column 6, line 09 - line 46; figures 2,3A,3B * * column 19, line 14 - line 42; figure 14 * * column 28, line 63 - line 66; figure 39E * [A] 7,8;
 [A]JPS6014219
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 129, Database accession no. (P - 361), [A] 7,8 * abstract *