Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0721777

EP0721777 - Use of tomoxetine for the treatment of attention deficit/hyperactivity disorder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2003
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.08.2003  [2003/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/29]For all designated states
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Heiligenstein, John Harrison
1202 West 56th Street
Indianapolis, Indiana 46208 / US
02 / Tollefson, Gary Dennis
9052 Diamond Pointe
Indianapolis, Indiana 46236 / US
[1996/29]
Representative(s)Vaughan, Jennifer Ann , et al
Eli Lilly and Company Limited
Lilly Research Centre
Erl Wood Manor
Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/29]Vaughan, Jennifer Ann , et al
Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor
Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
Former [1996/29]Hudson, Christopher Mark , et al
Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor
Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
Application number, filing date96300157.309.01.1996
[1996/29]
Priority number, dateUS1995037134111.01.1995         Original published format: US 371341
[1996/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0721777
Date:17.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0721777
Date:05.03.1997
[1997/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0721777
Date:28.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/138, A61P25/00
[2001/45]
Former International [1996/29]A61K31/135
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/29]
Extension statesLT17.01.1996
LV17.01.1996
SI17.01.1996
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Tomoxetin zur Behandlung von Hyperaktivität mit Aufmerksamkeitsstörungen[1996/29]
English:Use of tomoxetine for the treatment of attention deficit/hyperactivity disorder[1996/29]
French:Utilisation de tomoxetine pour le traitement de l'hyperactivité induite par les troubles d'attention[1996/29]
Examination procedure17.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/29]
28.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2002Fee for grant paid
24.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34]
Request for further processing for:09.08.1999Request for further processing filed
09.08.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.08.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[E]WO9607656  (ELI LILLY AND CO) [E] 1-7 * p.1, l.29-31; p.3, l.5 *;
 [E]WO9612485  (ELI LILLY AND CO) [E] 1-7 *p.1, l17-18; p.5, l.20; claims *;
 [Y]  - M.J. NORDEN, "Fluoxetine in borderline personality disorder", PROG. NEURO-PSYCHOPHARMACOL. & BIOL. PSYCHIATRY, (1989), vol. 13, pages 885 - 93, XP002021275 [Y] 1-7 * abstract *
 [Y]  - SALETU ET AL, "Tandamine- a new norepinephrine reuptake inhibitor", INT. PHARMACOPSYCHIAT., (1977), vol. 12, pages 137 - 52, XP000605654 [Y] 1-7 * abstract; p.145-6, Psychometric findings *
Examination   - SPENCER ET AL, "Effectiveness and tolerability of tomoxetine in adults with attention deficit hyperactivity disorder", AM. J. PSYCHIATRY, vol. 155, no. 5, pages 693 - 5