Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0721841

EP0721841 - Liquid ejecting head, liquid ejecting device and liquid ejecting method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/29]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kudo, Kiyomitsu
c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Sugitani, Hiroshi
c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Ikeda, Masami
c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Kimura, Makiko
c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Yoshihira, Aya
c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
06 / Nakata, Yoshie
c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
07 / Kashino, Toshio
c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
08 / Okazaki, Takeshi
c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1996/29]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/29]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date96300242.312.01.1996
[1996/29]
Priority number, dateJP1995000410913.01.1995         Original published format: JP 410995
JP1995012844826.05.1995         Original published format: JP 12844895
[1996/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0721841
Date:17.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0721841
Date:16.04.1997
[1997/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0721841
Date:14.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/05, B41J2/14
[1996/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/29]
TitleGerman:Flüssigkeitsausstosskopf, Vorrichtung zum Ausstossen von Flüssigkeit und Verfahren zum Ausstossen von Flüssigkeit[1996/29]
English:Liquid ejecting head, liquid ejecting device and liquid ejecting method[1996/29]
French:Tête d'éjection de liquide, dispositif d'éjection de liquide et procédé d'éjection de liquide[1996/29]
Examination procedure29.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/44]
21.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.02.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
07.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2002Fee for grant paid
19.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02079443.4  / EP1281521
Opposition(s)17.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19]
Request for further processing for:11.09.2002Request for further processing filed
11.09.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.10.2002Decision despatched
10.02.2000Request for further processing filed
10.02.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.03.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.05.2003
BE14.05.2003
CH14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
DK14.08.2003
GR14.08.2003
PT14.08.2003
SE14.08.2003
ES25.08.2003
IE12.01.2004
LU12.01.2004
[2005/23]
Former [2005/03]AT14.05.2003
BE14.05.2003
CH14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
DK14.08.2003
GR14.08.2003
PT14.08.2003
SE14.08.2003
ES25.08.2003
IE12.01.2004
Former [2004/28]AT14.05.2003
BE14.05.2003
CH14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
DK14.08.2003
GR14.08.2003
PT14.08.2003
SE14.08.2003
ES25.08.2003
Former [2004/23]AT14.05.2003
CH14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
DK14.08.2003
GR14.08.2003
PT14.08.2003
SE14.08.2003
ES25.08.2003
Former [2004/03]AT14.05.2003
CH14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
GR14.08.2003
PT14.08.2003
SE14.08.2003
ES25.08.2003
Former [2004/02]CH14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
GR14.08.2003
PT14.08.2003
SE14.08.2003
Former [2004/01]CH14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
SE14.08.2003
Former [2003/50]SE14.08.2003
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5278585  (KARZ ROBERT S ET AL) [X] 1,9-12,27,28,38,44-49,59,66,84,85 * abstract * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 6 * * column 6, line 42 - column 6, line 57 * * figures 3,5; claim - * [A] 1-16,66-85;
 [XA]EP0436047  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,9-13,15,27,32,38,44-49,59,66,84,85 * abstract * * column 7, line 3 - column 7, line 48 * * figure 7; claim - * [A] 17-43,50-65;
 [X]JPH05124189  ;
 [A]JPS62222854  ;
 [A]EP0504879  (CANON KK) [A] 2-6,17-21,50 * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 8 * * page 14, line 21 - page 14, line 39 * * page 15, line 11 - page 15, line 14 * * figures 23-25 *;
 [A]JPH04185447  ;
 [A]JPS6328654  ;
 [A]US4487662  (FISCHBECK KENNETH H) [A] 1,84,85 * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930907), vol. 017, no. 493, Database accession no. (M - 1475), & JP05124189 A 19930521 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,27,84,85 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880315), vol. 012, no. 081, Database accession no. (M - 676), & JP62222854 A 19870930 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-3,44,50,66,84,85 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921016), vol. 016, no. 503, Database accession no. (M - 1326), & JP04185447 A 19920702 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 2-6,17-21,50 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880706), vol. 012, no. 236, Database accession no. (M - 715), & JP63028654 A 19880206 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,44,84,85 * abstract *