Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0725053

EP0725053 - Selected O-quinonediazide sulfonic acid esters of phenolic compounds and their use in radiation-sensitive compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OLIN MICROELECTRONIC CHEMICALS, INC.
501 Merrit 7
Norwalk, Connecticut 06856-4500 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/39]For all designated states
Olin Microelectronic Chemicals, Inc.
501 Merrit 7
Norwalk, Connecticut 06856-4500 / US
Former [1996/32]For all designated states
OCG MICROELECTRONIC MATERIALS, INC.
350 Knotter Drive, P.O. Box 586
Cheshire, Connecticut 06410-0586 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Blakeney, Andrew J.
30 Brookside Court
Seekonk, Massachusetts 02771 / US
02 / Medina, Arturo N.
143 Balch Street
Pawtucket, Rhode Island 02861 / US
03 / Toukhy, Medhat A.
7 Congress Road
Barrington, Rhode Island 02806 / US
04 / Ferreira, Lawrence
598 Walnut Street
Fall River, Massachusetts 02720 / US
05 / Tadros, Sobhy
150 Coyle Drive
Seekonk, Massachusetts 02771 / US
[2000/14]
Former [1996/32]01 / Blakeney, Andrew J.
30 Brookside Court
Seekonk, Massachsetts 02771 / US
02 / Medina, Arturo N.
143 Balch Street
Pawtucket, Rhode Island 02861 / US
03 / Toukhy, Medhat A.
7 Congress Road
Barrington, Rhode Island 02806 / US
04 / Ferreira, Lawrence
598 Walnut Street
Fall River, Massachusetts 02720 / US
05 / Tadros, Sobhy
150 Coyle Drive
Seekonk, Massachusetts 02771 / US
Representative(s)Bannerman, David Gardner , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/47]Bannerman, David Gardner , et al
Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn
London, EC1N 2JT / GB
Former [1996/32]Baker, Colin John , et al
Withers & Rogers, 4 Dyer's Buildings, Holborn
London EC1N 2JT / GB
Application number, filing date96300364.518.01.1996
[1996/32]
Priority number, dateUS1995038450101.02.1995         Original published format: US 384501
[1996/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0725053
Date:07.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0725053
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07C49/23, C07C309/76, G03F7/022
[1996/32]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [1996/32]
TitleGerman:Ausgewählte O-chinondiazidsulfonsäureester von phenolischen Verbindungen und deren Verwendung in strahlungsempfindlichen Gemischen[1996/32]
English:Selected O-quinonediazide sulfonic acid esters of phenolic compounds and their use in radiation-sensitive compositions[1996/32]
French:Esters particuliers d'acide O-quinonediazidesulfonique de composés phénoliques et leur utilisation dans les compositions sensibles aux radiations[1996/32]
Examination procedure22.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/38]
25.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
08.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.1999Fee for grant paid
08.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP98100123.3  / EP0840170
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Request for further processing for:30.12.1997Request for further processing filed
19.12.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.03.1998Decision despatched
17.12.1997Request for further processing filed
19.12.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
27.03.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0440238  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10 * claims 1,10 *
 [A]  - A. CASTELLAN ET AL, "Photochemistry of quinones and hydroquinones in solid 2-hydroxypropyl cellulose and on filter paper. UV-visible absorption and diffuse reflectance spectroscopy", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940321), vol. 120, no. 12, Database accession no. 137417g, XP002003125 [A] 1,4 * abstract *
    [] - "Photochemistry of lignocellulosic materials", ACS SYMP. SER., (1993), no. 531, pages 60 - 76,
Examination   - MEDINA ET AL., "A novel class of highly selective divanillin-based PACs", SPIE, (19960101), vol. 2724, pages 448 - 459,