EP0727433 - Process for the preparation of 1-(2'-deoxy-2',2'-difluoro-d-ribo-pentofuranosyl)-cytosine from 2-deoxy-2,2-difluoro-beta-d-ribo-pentopyranose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wirth, David D. 4448 Yale Drive Lafayette, Indiana 47905 / US | [1996/34] | Representative(s) | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300419.7 | 22.01.1996 | [1996/34] | Priority number, date | US19950383165 | 03.02.1995 Original published format: US 383165 | [1996/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0727433 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0727433 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/06, C07H15/18 | [1996/34] | CPC: |
C07H15/18 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07H19/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1-(2'-Desoxy-2',2'-difluoro-d-ribo-pentofuranosyl)-cytosin aus 2-Desoxy-2,2-difluoro-beta-d-ribo-pentopyranose | [1996/34] | English: | Process for the preparation of 1-(2'-deoxy-2',2'-difluoro-d-ribo-pentofuranosyl)-cytosine from 2-deoxy-2,2-difluoro-beta-d-ribo-pentopyranose | [1996/34] | French: | Procédé de préparation de 1-(2'déoxy-2',2'-difluoro-d-ribo-pentofuranosyl)-cytosine à partir de 2-déoxy-2,2-difluoro-bêta-d-ribo-pentopyranose | [1996/34] | Examination procedure | 30.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/34] | 25.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2002/13] | CH | 14.03.2001 | |
LI | 14.03.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0306190 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [A] 1,5 * example 7 *; | [AD]US4954623 (NAGARAJAN RAMAKRISHNAN [US]) [AD] 1,5 * column W *; | [AD] - HETEL L.W. ET AL, "Synthesis of 2-Deoxy-2,2-difluoro-D-ribose and 2-Deoxy-2,2-difluoro-D-ribofuranosyl Nucleosides", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON US, (1988), vol. 53, pages 2406 - 2409, XP002005536 [AD] 1,5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00246a002 |