EP0722748 - Anesthetic vaporizer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Healthcare Finland Oy Kuortaneenkatu 2 00510 Helsinki / FI | For all designated states Instrumentarium International Oy Kuortaneenkatu 2 00510 Helsinki / FI | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Instrumentarium Corporation Kuortaneenkatu 2 00520 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states Instrumentarium Oyj Kuortaneenkatu 2 00520 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1996/30] | For all designated states Instrumentarium Oy Kuortaneenkatu 2 SF-00510 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Särelä, Antti Väino Auerinkatu 1 P 55 FIN-00550 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
Heinonen Erkki Mehiläistie 24 FIN-00750 Helsinki / FI | [1996/30] | Representative(s) | Valkeiskangas, Tapio Lassi Paavali, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | Valkeiskangas, Tapio Lassi Paavali, et al Oy Kolster Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2004/22] | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2002/32] | Charlton, Peter John, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1996/30] | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300456.9 | 23.01.1996 | [1996/30] | Priority number, date | FI19950000289 | 23.01.1995 Original published format: FI 950289 | [1996/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0722748 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0722748 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | [1996/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0722748 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/18 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
A61M16/18 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US);
A61M2016/1035 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/30] | Title | German: | Narkosemittelverdunster | [1996/30] | English: | Anesthetic vaporizer | [1996/30] | French: | Evaporateur de solution anesthétique | [1996/30] | Examination procedure | 26.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 07.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00203478.3 / EP1064962 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.06.2003
05.07.2003
ADMISSIBLE Drägerwerk AG Moislinger Allee 53-55 23558 Lübeck / DE Opponent's representative Ahme, Johannes, et al, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.06.2003
05.07.2003
ADMISSIBLE Drägerwerk AG Moislinger Allee 53-55 23558 Lübeck / DE Opponent's representative Ahme, Johannes, Dr., et al, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | 25.09.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.03.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.10.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.01.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.06.2006 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/01] | Appeal following opposition | 14.03.2005 | Appeal received No. T0384/05 | 12.05.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.06.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 27.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.07.2006 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.11.2002 | NL | 13.11.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/30] | NL | 13.11.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4770168 (RUSZ TIBOR [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 35 * * column 5, line 10 - line 31 * [Y] 9,10; | [YD]GB2097272 (DRAEGERWERK AG) [YD] 9,10 * abstract * * page 2, line 71 - line 83 *; | [A]US3703172 (HAY WAYNE W) [A] 3,8 * abstract *; | [A]US4611590 (RYSCHKA MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - line 38 * |