Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0724258

EP0724258 - Optical feedback photodetecting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.09.2003  [2003/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K.K.
1126-1 Ichino-cho
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/31]For all designated states
HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K.K.
1126-1 Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi
Shizuoka-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Koishi, Musubu
c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
02 / Shirakawa, Kouichi
c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
03 / Takeshima, Akira
c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
[1996/31]
Representative(s)Whitten, George Alan , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/31]Whitten, George Alan , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date96300568.126.01.1996
[1996/31]
Priority number, dateJP1995001101226.01.1995         Original published format: JP 1101295
[1996/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0724258
Date:31.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0724258
Date:08.01.1997
[1997/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0724258
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/13, G02B21/00, G01J1/42, G11B7/125, H01S3/00
[2002/38]
Former International [1997/02]G11B7/13, G02B21/00, G01J1/42, H01S3/133, G11B7/125, H01S3/00
Former International [1996/31]G11B7/13, G02B21/00, G01J1/42, H01S3/133
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1996/31]
TitleGerman:Optische Rückkopplungs-Photodetektorvorrichtung[1996/31]
English:Optical feedback photodetecting apparatus[1996/31]
French:Dispositif photodétecteur à contre-réaction optique[1996/31]
Examination procedure01.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/35]
10.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2002Fee for grant paid
10.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US4460977  (SHIMADA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4449204  (SHIMADA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS6145414  ;
 [A]JPH01232544  ;
 [A]JPS5636185  ;
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860715), vol. 010, no. 202, Database accession no. (P - 477), [A] 1,10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891212), vol. 013, no. 557, Database accession no. (P - 974), [A] 1,10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810613), vol. 005, no. 091, Database accession no. (E - 061), [A] 1,10 * abstract *
 [A]  - MITSUHASHI ET AL., "Self-coupled Optical Pickup (II) and its Application", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, BRUSSELS, BELGIUM, (19840625), vol. 490, pages 102 - 109, XP002018416