Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0725497

EP0725497 - Data receiving apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.04.2005  [2005/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/08]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [1996/32]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Futagi, Sadaki
1-6-30-203, Kyowa
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Uesugi, Mitsuru
13-33, 3-14-6, Kamoi, Midori-ku
Yokohama / JP
[1996/32]
Representative(s)Senior, Alan Murray
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/32]Senior, Alan Murray
J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date96300677.031.01.1996
[1996/32]
Priority number, dateJP1995001479931.01.1995         Original published format: JP 1479995
[1996/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0725497
Date:07.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0725497
Date:06.09.2000
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0725497
Date:21.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/005, H04B7/08
[1996/32]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/32]
TitleGerman:Datenempfänger[1996/32]
English:Data receiving apparatus[1996/32]
French:Récepteur de données[1996/32]
Examination procedure10.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/32]
20.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2004Fee for grant paid
18.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0631399  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,17 * page 2, lines 8-23 * * page 2, line 45 - page 3, line 10 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]JPH0435548
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920520), vol. 016, no. 215, Database accession no. (E - 1204), [A] 1-4,9-12,17 * abstract *