Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0730274

EP0730274 - Compact disc recording system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.03.2003
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.05.2003  [2003/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roxio, Inc.
455 El Camino Real
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
[2002/35]
Former [2002/04]For all designated states
Roxio, Inc.
461 South Milpitas Boulevard
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
Former [1999/09]For all designated states
ADAPTEC, INC.
691 South Milpitas Boulevard
Milpitas, California 95035 / US
Former [1996/36]For all designated states
INCAT SYSTEMS SOFTWARE U.S.A., INC.
1684 Dell Avenue
Campbell, California 95008 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Caffarelli, Fabrizio
6636 Mount Hope Drive
San Jose, California 95120 / US
02 / D'Amato, Andrea
6561 Jeremie Drive
San Jose, California / US
[1999/45]
Former [1996/36]01 / Caffarelli, Fabrizio
6636 Mount Hope Drive
San Jose, California 95120 / US
Representative(s)Hamilton, Alistair , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/36]Hamilton, Alistair , et al
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date96300998.014.02.1996
[1996/36]
Priority number, dateUS1995039766028.02.1995         Original published format: US 397660
[1996/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0730274
Date:04.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0730274
Date:28.05.1997
[1997/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0730274
Date:15.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/034, G11B27/32, G11B20/10, G11B20/12, G11B7/00, G11B7/007, G11B23/36
[1997/21]
Former International [1996/36]G11B27/034, G11B27/32, G11B20/10, G11B20/12, G11B7/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/10]
Former [1996/36]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  NL 
TitleGerman:Compact Disc Aufzeichnungssystem und Verfahren[1996/36]
English:Compact disc recording system and method[1996/36]
French:Système et procédé d'enregistrement d'un disque compact[1996/36]
Examination procedure19.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/03]
13.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2002Fee for grant paid
08.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0507397  (PHILIPS NV) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [E]EP0712130  (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO) [E] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0507403  (PHILIPS NV);
 [A]WO9309496  (MERIDIAN DATA INC);
 [A]EP0390268  (PHILIPS NV)