blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0729280


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.04.2001 [2001/15]
10.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
25.02.2000 Renewal fee
25.11.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant
01.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
16.07.1999 Examination report or reply
01.04.1999 First examination report
31.03.1999 Examination report or reply
08.03.1999 Renewal fee
20.02.1998 Renewal fee
09.05.1997 Request for examination filed published on  25.06.1997 [1997/26]
13.09.1996 Publication of search report published on  30.10.1996 [1996/44]
12.07.1996 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.08.1996 [1996/35]