Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0729280

EP0729280 - Transmission monitoring system and method for testing the transmission quality [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[1996/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Jukl, Milan F.
1807 Holland Brook Road
Neshanic Station, New Jersey 08853 / US
02 / Savicki, Joseph P.
6 Haver Farm Road
Clinton, New Jersey 08809 / US
03 / Leighton, William J., III
1971 Grenville Road
Scotch Plains, New Jersey 07076 / US
[1996/35]
Representative(s)Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/35]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date96301027.714.02.1996
[1996/35]
Priority number, dateUS1995039513727.02.1995         Original published format: US 395137
[1996/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0729280
Date:28.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0729280
Date:30.10.1996
[1996/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0729280
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:H04N17/00
[1996/35]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1996/35]
TitleGerman:Überwachungssystem für ein Übertragungssystem und Verfahren zum Prüfen der Übertragungsqualität[1996/35]
English:Transmission monitoring system and method for testing the transmission quality[1996/35]
French:Appareil de surveillance d'une transmission et procédé pour contrôler la qualité de transmission[1996/35]
Examination procedure17.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/26]
07.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.1999Fee for grant paid
12.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2694813  (ITIBAR PIERRE [FR]) [Y] 1-12 * page 4, line 2 - page 10, line 8 *;
 [Y]US5155590  (BEYERS II ROBERT J [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 5, line 34 - column 8, line 27 * * column 10, line 51 - column 12, line 19 * * column 17, line 1 - column 26, line 9 * * column 28, line 39 - column 31, line 52 * * column 41, line 64 - column 44, line 40 * * column 48, line 35 - column 54, line 8 *;
 [A]US5274446  (ASHIDA YASUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 9, line 46 - column 11, line 62 *;
 [A]EP0419697  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,5-9,11,12 * column W *;
 [A]EP0145605  (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,5-9,11,12 * column W *;
 [A]DE3601605  (WANDEL & GOLTERMANN [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column W *;
 [A]DE4333953  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column W *;
 [A]EP0510519  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [FR]) [A] 1-12 * column W *
 [A]  SCHNABL F. ET AL, "TV-MESSSYSTEM MIT PRÜFZEILENMESSEMPFÄNGER", FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK, BERLIN DE, (19940930), vol. 48, no. 9, pages 451 - 458, XP000468750 [A] 1-12 * page 458, column M, line 32 - column R, line 60 *