Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0727443

EP0727443 - Catalyst for olefin polymerization and process for producing olefin polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.11.2001
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.01.2002  [2002/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOSOH CORPORATION
4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi
Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
Tosoh Corporation
4560, Kaisei-cho
Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP
Former [1996/34]For all designated states
Tosoh Corporation
4560, Kaisei-cho
Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kaneko, Toshiyuki
129 Hazuotsu
Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP
02 / Sato, Morihiko
129 Hazuotsu
Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP
[1996/34]
Representative(s)Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas , et al
KILBURN & STRODE 20 Red Lion Street
London, WC1R 4PJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/34]Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas , et al
KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street
London, WC1N 2DD / GB
Application number, filing date96301101.019.02.1996
[1996/34]
Priority number, dateJP1995003093320.02.1995         Original published format: JP 3093395
[1996/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0727443
Date:21.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0727443
Date:17.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.1996
ClassificationInternational:C08F4/60, C08F10/00
[1996/34]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/34]
TitleGerman:Katalysator für die Polymerisation von Olefinen und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Olefinpolymerisaten[1996/34]
English:Catalyst for olefin polymerization and process for producing olefin polymers[1996/34]
French:Catalyseur pour la polymérisation des oléfines et méthode pour la préparation de polymères des oléfines[1996/34]
Examination procedure16.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/07]
30.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.07.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2000Fee for grant paid
08.08.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.10.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9311172  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 18, lines 21-22, and page 36, line 5 to page 38, line 14 *;
 [A]WO9109882  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * claim 9; page 16, line 9 to page 17, line 14; page 22, lines 20-30; examples 10, 12, 14 *;
 [A]WO9403506  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 5, lines 33-35, and page 23, lines 6-14 *