Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0729080

EP0729080 - Release liquid supply device and liquid absorbing material for use therein [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JAPAN GORE-TEX, INC.
42-5, 1-chome Akazutsumi Setagaya-ku
Tokyo 156 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/35]For all designated states
JAPAN GORE-TEX, INC.
42-5, 1-chome Akazutsumi
Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kato, Hiroshi
508-18, Seki, Okayama-Shi
Okayama-Ken 703 / JP
02 / Kikukawa, Hiroyasu
7-28, Seikihonmachi, Okayama-Shi
Okayama-Ken 700 / JP
[1996/35]
Representative(s)McCallum, William Potter , et al
Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow
G1 3AE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/35]McCallum, William Potter , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date96301140.821.02.1996
[1996/35]
Priority number, dateJP1995005797322.02.1995         Original published format: JP 5797395
[1996/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0729080
Date:28.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0729080
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/20
[1996/35]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1996/35]
TitleGerman:Trennmittel-Flüssigkeitsdosierungsvorrichtung und flüssigkeitsabsorbierendes Material dafür[1996/35]
English:Release liquid supply device and liquid absorbing material for use therein[1996/35]
French:Dispositif de dosage d'agent séparateur et matériau absorbateur de liquide pour l'utilisation dans celui-ci[1996/35]
Examination procedure18.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/09]
15.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.1999Fee for grant paid
04.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
05.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
03.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0616271  (JAPAN GORE TEX INC [JP]) [A] 1,9-13,16,17 * column 1, paragraph 1; figure 2; claims 1-4 * * column 9, line 24 - column 11, line 36 *;
 [A]WO9320483  (GORE W L & ASS UK [GB], et al) [A] 1,16,17 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * figure 2; claims 1-8 * * page 8, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 *;
 [DA]JPH05123623  ;
 [A]US5267004  (MILLS BORDEN H [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, paragraph 1; figure 6 * * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 12 *;
 [A]JPH0744051
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930906), vol. 017, no. 489, Database accession no. (C - 1106), [DA] 1,2,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 95, no. 002, [A] 12 * abstract *