Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0733873

EP0733873 - Method and system for aircraft weapon station testing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RAYTHEON COMPANY
2000 East El Segundo Boulevard
P.O. Box 902
El Segundo, CA 90245 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/28]For all designated states
Raytheon Company
P.O. Box 902, 2000 El Segundo Blvd.
El Segundo, California 90245 / US
Former [1996/39]For all designated states
HUGHES MISSILE SYSTEMS COMPANY
7200 Hughes Terrace
Los Angeles, California 90045 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Monk, Winston R.
9421 E. Placita Cascada
Tucson, AZ 85715 / US
02 / van Cleve, David P.
5245 W. Paseo Del Campo
Tucson, AZ 85745 / US
[1996/39]
Representative(s)Jackson, Richard Eric
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Jackson, Richard Eric
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [1996/39]Jackson, Richard Eric
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date96301238.023.02.1996
[1996/39]
Priority number, dateUS1995040910623.03.1995         Original published format: US 409106
[1996/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0733873
Date:25.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0733873
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.1996
ClassificationInternational:F41G7/00
[1996/39]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1996/39]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Prüfung der Waffenträger eines Flugzeuges[1996/39]
English:Method and system for aircraft weapon station testing[1996/39]
French:Procédé et système pour vérifier les supports d'arme d'un avion[1996/39]
Examination procedure05.03.1997Examination requested  [1997/18]
11.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.1999Fee for grant paid
22.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
19.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0579143  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1,8 * column A * * page 4, line 39 - page 8, line 53; figures 1-9 *