Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0730021

EP0730021 - Dispersant-viscosity improvers for lubricating oil compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Lubrizol Corporation
29400 Lakeland Boulevard
Wickliffe, Ohio 44092 / US
[1996/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Lange, Richard Michael
155 East 207th Street
Euclid, Ohio 44123 / US
02 / Luciani, Carmen Vincent
30383 Bridle Path Trail
Wickliffe, Ohio 44092 / US
[1996/36]
Representative(s)Crisp, David Norman , et al
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/36]Crisp, David Norman , et al
D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date96301308.127.02.1996
[1996/36]
Priority number, dateUS1995039819502.03.1995         Original published format: US 398195
[1996/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0730021
Date:04.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0730021
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.1996
ClassificationInternational:C10M133/52, C10M159/12, C10M163/00, C08G63/00, // (C10M159/12, 143:10, 143:12, 145:10, 145:22, 133:06, 129:26),(C10M163/00, 129:76, 133:16, 133:56, 135:02, 135:30, 137:10, 143:10, 145:10, 145:36, 145:28, 155:02, 159:12, 159:22, 159:24),(C10N30/02, 30:04, 40:25)
[1996/36]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1996/36]
TitleGerman:Dispergier- und Viskositätsverbesserer für Schmierölzusammensetzungen[1996/36]
English:Dispersant-viscosity improvers for lubricating oil compositions[1996/36]
French:Additifs pour compositions d'huile lubrifiante améliorant la dispersibilité et la viscosité[1996/36]
Examination procedure03.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/14]
19.08.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
02.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
21.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.1999Fee for grant paid
06.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
05.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DA]US4670173  (HAYASHI KATSUMI [US], et al) [DA] 1-18 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 68 * * column 32, line 63 - column 33, line 14 * * column 28, line 24 - line 32 *;
 [DA]US5049294  (VAN ZON ARIE [NL], et al) [DA] 1-11 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 10 *;
 [A]US4839068  (LANGE RICHARD M [US]) [A] 1,2,6,8 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 39 *