Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0731519

EP0731519 - Protonic conductor and electrochemical device using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
For all designated states
JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO., LTD.
11-24, Tsukiji-2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/37]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
For all designated states
JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO., LTD.
11-24, Tsukiji-2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takada, Kazunori
4-6, Hirano-honmachi 5-chome
Hirano-ku, Osaka City, 547 / JP
02 / Kondo, Shigeo
16-14, Kuzuha-asahi 1-chome
Hirakata City, 573 / JP
03 / Minami, Tsutomu
7-1, Ohnodai 2-chome
Osakasayama City, 589 / JP
04 / Tatsumisago, Masahiro
445-31, Jouroku
Sakai City, 588 / JP
05 / Takeuchi, Yasumasa
22-32, Shiratoridai
Aoba-ku, Yokohama City, 227 / JP
[1996/37]
Representative(s)Nachshen, Neil Jacob
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/15]Nachshen, Neil Jacob
D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [1996/37]Thomas, Roger Tamlyn
D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date96301344.628.02.1996
[1996/37]
Priority number, dateJP1995004743207.03.1995         Original published format: JP 4743295
[1996/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0731519
Date:11.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0731519
Date:23.10.1996
[1996/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0731519
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/10, H01M6/18, G02F1/15
[1996/41]
Former International [1996/37]H01M8/10, H01M6/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/37]
TitleGerman:Protonischer Leiter und seine Verwendung in eine elektrochemische Vorrichtung[1996/37]
English:Protonic conductor and electrochemical device using the same[1996/37]
French:Conducteur protonique et appareil électronique l'utilisant[1996/37]
Examination procedure22.03.1996Examination requested  [1996/37]
02.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.1999Fee for grant paid
13.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
02.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS60263923  ;
 [A]JPH0411608
 [A]  - TASUMISAGO ET AL, "Proton-conducting silica-gel films doped with a variety of electrolytes", SOLID STATE IONICS, NETHERLANDS, (1994), vol. 3,4, no. 74, pages 105 - 108, XP002010966 [A] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860529), vol. 010, no. 147, Database accession no. (P - 460), & JP60263923 A 19851227 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 09, Database accession no. 92-068344, XP002010967 & JPH0411608 A 19920116 (MATSUSHITA ELEC IND KK) [A] 1,2,5,6,9 * abstract *
Examination   - Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology,3rd Edition, Volume 8,Pages 626-629