Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0731097

EP0731097 - Benzofuran pharmaceutical compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/37]Novel benzofuran pharmaceutical compounds
[2000/06]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.01.2001 [2001/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
307 East McCarty Street
Indianapolis IN 46285 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/37]For all designated states
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
307, East McCarty Street
Indianapolis Indiana 46285 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bryant, Henry Uhlman
7840 Camelback Drive
Indianapolis, Indiana 46250 / US
02 / Dodge, Jeffrey Alan
11134 Indian Lake Boulevard
Indianapolis, Indiana 46236 / US
[1996/37]
Representative(s)Tapping, Kenneth George , et al
Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham
Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/37]Tapping, Kenneth George , et al
Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor
Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
Application number, filing date96301537.506.03.1996
[1996/37]
Priority number, dateUS1995040228510.03.1995         Original published format: US 402285
[1996/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0731097
Date:11.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0731097
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07D307/80, C07F7/18, A61K31/34
[1996/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/37]
Extension statesAL13.03.1996
LT13.03.1996
LV13.03.1996
SI13.03.1996
TitleGerman:Pharmazeutische Benzofuranverbindungen[1996/37]
English:Benzofuran pharmaceutical compounds[2000/06]
French:Composés pharmaceutiques de benzofuranne[1996/37]
Former [1996/37]Novel benzofuran pharmaceutical compounds
Examination procedure13.03.1996Examination requested  [1996/37]
12.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
14.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
31.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
31.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.1999Fee for grant paid
04.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US5354861  (SIM KENG-YEOW [SG], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [DA]US4133814  (JONES C DAVID, et al) [DA] 1-10 * abstract *
 [A]  N. DURANI ET AL., "Structure-Activity Relationship of Antiestrogens: A Study Using Triarylbutenone, Benzofuran, and Triarylfuran Analogues as Models for Triarylethylenes and Triarylpropenones", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, (198908), vol. 32, no. 8, pages 1700 - 1707, XP000573924 [A] 1-10 * page 1702; table II *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00128a006