Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0733472

EP0733472 - Multilayer films for packaging and administering medical solutions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  26.08.2011
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cryovac, Inc.
100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A
Duncan, SC 29334-0464 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]For all designated states
Cryovac, Inc.
100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A
Duncan, S.C. 29334-0464 / US
Former [1998/46]For all designated states
Cryovac, Inc.
100 Rogers Bridge Road
Duncan, 29334 S.C. / US
Former [1996/39]For all designated states
W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn.
1114 Avenue of the Americas
New York New York 10036 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mueller, Walter B.
280 Bertha Burns Road
Inman, SC 29349 / US
[1996/39]
Representative(s)Price, Nigel John King , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Price, Nigel John King , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2008/10]Price, Nigel John King , et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [1996/39]Senior, Alan Murray
J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date96301926.021.03.1996
[1996/39]
Priority number, dateUS1995040866822.03.1995         Original published format: US 408668
[1996/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0733472
Date:25.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0733472
Date:10.02.1999
[1999/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0733472
Date:04.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/49]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0733472
Date:28.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61J1/10, B32B27/32
[1999/05]
Former International [1998/42]A47J37/07, F24C15/10
Former International [1996/39]B32B27/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/39]
TitleGerman:Mehrschichtfolie zur Verpackung und Verabreichung medizinischer Lösungen[1996/39]
English:Multilayer films for packaging and administering medical solutions[1996/39]
French:Film à plusieurs couches pour l'emballage et l'administration de solutions médicales[1996/39]
Examination procedure22.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/20]
17.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2002Fee for grant paid
26.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.09.2003   
Baxter Healthcare Corpn
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US
Opponent's representative
Dee, Ian Mark
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2003/44]
Opponent(s)01  03.09.2003   
Baxter Healthcare Corpn
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US
Opponent's representative
Dee, Ian Mark
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
10.10.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.04.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.07.2005Date of oral proceedings
03.08.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.08.2005Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
26.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
30.06.2009Reply to a communication from the opposition division
30.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
24.11.2009Reply to a communication from the opposition division
17.01.2011Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.03.2011
09.02.2011Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.02.2011Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.03.2011Date of oral proceedings
30.05.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
16.08.2011Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition09.09.2005Appeal received No.  T1186/05
09.12.2005Statement of grounds filed
06.12.2007Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
06.12.2007Date of oral proceedings
13.12.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.04.200005   M06   Fee paid on   13.04.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.12.2002
[2015/21]
Former [2012/11]AT04.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0597502  (GRACE W R & CO) [X] 1-3 * page 5, line 27 - line 29; examples 6-8 *;
 [Y]US5206075  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC) [Y] 1-3,8,9 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]EP0641647  (GUNZE KK ;UBE INDUSTRIES (JP)) [Y] 1-3,8,9 * claims 1,7 *;
 [A]EP0600425  (GRACE W R & CO) [A] 1-9 * claim - *
OppositionWO9513918
 US4643926
 US5278272
 US5206075
 US4397916
 WO9313143
 US3645992
 US6100357
 US5480945
 US4762882
    - Product data sheet on Eltex KS409x6206 (exhibits the date 03.09.03)