Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0734854 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0734854



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 669
11.08.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
13.10.2008 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
13.10.2008 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
06.10.2008 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
18.09.2008 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
18.09.2008 French translation of claims Opposition 5
18.09.2008 German translation of the claims Opposition 4
19.08.2008 Request for issuance of patent certificate with patent specification Opposition 1
11.06.2008 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
11.06.2008 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
11.06.2008 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
04.06.2008 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
13.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.02.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.02.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.02.2008 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
18.02.2008 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 3
18.02.2008 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
18.02.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.02.2008 Text intended for grant Opposition 18
07.02.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.12.2007 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
14.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2007 Claims Opposition 1
02.11.2007 Description Opposition 5
02.11.2007 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
23.07.2007 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
23.07.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.06.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
04.06.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.06.2007 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 25
28.02.2007 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 7
27.12.2006 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
11.12.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.12.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.12.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.11.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.11.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.10.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
24.10.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
19.10.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.10.2006 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
09.10.2006 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.10.2005 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
29.06.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.06.2005 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.06.2005 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.06.2005 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.06.2005 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.06.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
24.06.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 26
22.06.2005 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.06.2005 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.06.2005 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.06.2005 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.06.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
22.06.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 26
29.04.2005 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
27.04.2005 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
25.04.2005 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
16.12.2004 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.12.2004 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 2
10.12.2004 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 2
10.12.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
10.12.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
08.12.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
08.12.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
07.12.2004 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
17.09.2004 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
15.09.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
17.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.08.2004 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
04.08.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.08.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.08.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.07.2004 Request for change of name Opposition 3
29.07.2004 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
29.07.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
29.07.2004 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
29.07.2004 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
29.07.2004 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
29.07.2004 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
29.07.2004 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.05.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.05.2004 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
30.04.2004 Request for change of name Opposition 6
02.04.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.03.2004 Submission concerning representation Opposition 2
21.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.02.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
14.02.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
14.02.2002 Claims Opposition 14
14.02.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 4
13.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.02.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
13.02.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
13.02.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 26
13.02.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.01.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.01.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.01.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
10.12.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.12.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
20.11.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.11.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.11.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.11.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.11.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
12.11.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
12.11.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
02.11.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.10.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.10.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
11.07.2001 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
11.07.2001 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
04.07.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.07.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
04.07.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
04.07.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
04.07.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
04.07.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.07.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.07.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.04.2001 Request for documents Opposition 1
28.03.2001 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.03.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
21.03.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
11.05.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.03.2000 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
29.02.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
07.02.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.02.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
07.02.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
16.11.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
21.10.1999 Description Search / examination 25
21.10.1999 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.09.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
13.09.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 23
13.09.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 26
25.06.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
25.06.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 38
10.06.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
24.06.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.06.1996 European search report Search / examination 2
24.05.1996 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
24.05.1996 Priority document Search / examination 19
24.05.1996 Priority document Search / examination 21
26.03.1996 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.03.1996 Claims Search / examination 5
26.03.1996 Description Search / examination 30
26.03.1996 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.03.1996 Drawings Search / examination 2
26.03.1996 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7