Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0738587

EP0738587 - Pressure closing mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2001
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELOPAK SYSTEMS AG
Cherstrasse 4 Postfach
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/52]For all designated states
ELOPAK SYSTEMS AG
Cherstrasse 4 Postfach
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
Former [1996/43]For all designated states
ELOPAK SYSTEMS AG
Cherstrasse 4 Postfach
CH-8152 Glattbrugg / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Showler, Michael F.
6558 Doyon Drive South
Waterford, Michigan 48327 / US
02 / McDonald, Kenneth Paul
1240 Morningdove
Wixom, Michigan 48393 / US
03 / Lukasiewicz, Anthony J.
886 Country Farm
Howell, Michigan 48843 / US
[1996/43]
Representative(s)Burrows, Anthony Gregory
Business Centre West
Avenue One, Business Park
Letchworth Garden City, Hertfordshire SG6 2HB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/43]Burrows, Anthony Gregory
Business Centre West Avenue One, Business Park
Letchworth Garden City Hertfordshire SG6 2HB / GB
Application number, filing date96302704.017.04.1996
[1996/43]
Priority number, dateUS1995042610521.04.1995         Original published format: US 426105
[1996/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0738587
Date:23.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0738587
Date:27.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:B31B5/74
[1996/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT,   SE [1996/43]
TitleGerman:Druckverschlussvorrichtung[1996/43]
English:Pressure closing mechanism[1996/43]
French:Mécanisme à pression de fermeture[1996/43]
Examination procedure13.03.1997Examination requested  [1997/19]
14.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.05.1999Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
19.06.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2000Fee for grant paid
19.09.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination11.08.1999Appeal received No.  T0848/99
11.08.1999Statement of grounds filed
03.05.2000Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Opposition(s)28.09.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB1292822  (TETRA PAK INTERNAT AKTIEBOLAG [SE]) [Y] 1,4,5,7-11 * page 7, line 53 - page 8, line 14; figure 5 *;
 [Y]WO8501013  (OMEGA ENG DESIGN [GB]) [Y] 1,4,5,7-11 * page 6, line 21 - line 27; figure 2 *;
 [A]US3555975  (BARNES BERNARD C) [A] 1,4,5,7-11 * column 5, line 50 - line 60; figures 6-8 *;
 [A]US4038908  (KAUFFMAN IVAN L) [A] 1,10 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0242805  (TETRA PAK AB [SE]) [A] 1,9 * figure 3 *