Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0741239

EP0741239 - Accessory drive system for an automotive engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 26.06.2002  [2002/26]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
Ford Motor Company Limited
Eagle Way Brentwood
Essex CM13 3BW / GB
For:DE 
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werk Köln-Niehl, Henry Ford Strasse
50735 Köln / DE
For:ES 
FORD MOTOR COMPANY
The American Road
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/45]For:GB 
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED
Eagle Way
Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB
For:DE 
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werk Köln-Niehl, Henry Ford Strasse
50735 Köln / DE
For:ES 
Ford Motor Company
The American Road
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Meckstroth, Richard
41557 Fallbrook
Northville, Michigan 48167 / US
02 / Toth, Gerard
10011 Hamilton Court
Belleville, Michigan 48111 / US
[1996/45]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/45]Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway
Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB
Application number, filing date96303062.201.05.1996
[1996/45]
Priority number, dateUS1995043710305.05.1995         Original published format: US 437103
[1996/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0741239
Date:06.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0741239
Date:20.11.1996
[1996/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0741239
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:F02B67/06
[1996/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB [1996/45]
TitleGerman:Antriebsvorrichtung für Hilfsgeräte für eine Brennkraftmaschine für Fahrzeuge[1996/45]
English:Accessory drive system for an automotive engine[1996/45]
French:Dispositif d'entraînement des auxiliaires pour un moteur à combustion interne de véhicule[1996/45]
Examination procedure05.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/05]
18.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.1999Fee for grant paid
09.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES22.03.2000
GB22.06.2000
DE24.06.2000
[2002/26]
Former [2002/13]GB22.06.2000
DE24.06.2000
Former [2001/28]GB22.06.2000
Documents cited:Search[XP]US5439420  (MECKSTROTH RICHARD J [US], et al) [XP] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0329855  (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0459798  (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2155582  (FORD MOTOR CO) [A] 1,2 * abstract *