Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0742259

EP0742259 - Latent mercaptans as multi-functional additives for halogen-containing polymer compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2001
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.10.2001 [2001/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago
Illinois 60606-1596 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/40]For all designated states
Morton International, Inc.
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, Illinois 60606-1596 / US
Former [1996/46]For all designated states
MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
100 North Riverside Plaza, Randolph Street at the River
Chicago, Illinois 60606 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Duvall, Tod C.
7692 Whitehall Circle, West
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
[1996/46]
Representative(s)Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/46]Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby , et al
BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date96303242.009.05.1996
[1996/46]
Priority number, dateUS1995043541310.05.1995         Original published format: US 435413
US1996059709323.02.1996         Original published format: US 597093
[1996/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0742259
Date:13.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0742259
Date:18.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:C08K5/37, C08L57/08
[1996/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1996/46]
TitleGerman:Latente Merkaptane als multifunktionelle Additive für halogenhaltige Polymerzusammensetzungen[1996/46]
English:Latent mercaptans as multi-functional additives for halogen-containing polymer compositions[1996/46]
French:Mercaptanes latentes comme additifs multi-fonctionnaux pour des compositions polymériques halogénées[1996/46]
Examination procedure21.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/26]
04.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
21.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
22.10.1999Fee for grant paid
22.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.04.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)19.07.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]GB1042639  (US RUBBER CO) [X] 1,2,35 * example 42; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0214932  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,22,35 * example -; table - *;
 [A]US5109046  (LARKIN WILLIAM A [US], et al) [A] 1,24-28 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]US3660331  (LUDWIG JEROME H) [X] 1,2,9,22,23,34-36 * claims 1,6,7,11,13; table 1 *;
 [X]US4519430  (AHMAD SHAMIM [US], et al) [X] 1 * claim 1 *
by applicantUS3503924
 US3869487
 US3979359
 US4134878
 US4183846
 US3507827
 US3078290
 US2985617