Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0761120

EP0761120 - Multiple-fold automatic umbrella with simplified control means [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FU TAI UMBRELLA WORKS, LTD.
No 16 Chen Tai Road, Sec 3, Wu-Ku Hsiang
Taipei Hsien 24801 / TW
[N/P]
Former [1997/11]For all designated states
FU TAI UMBRELLA WORKS, LTD.
No 16 Chen Tai Road, Sec 3, Wu-Ku Hsiang
Taipei Hsien 24801 / TW
Inventor(s)01 / Lin, Chung-Kuang
No. 16 Chen Tai Road Sec. 3
Wu Ku Hsiang Taipei, Hsien / TW
02 / Chang, Jung-Jen
No. 16 Chen Tai Road Sec. 3
Wu Ku Hsiang Taipei, Hsien / TW
[1997/11]
Representative(s)Calderbank, Thomas Roger , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Calderbank, Thomas Roger , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [1999/52](deleted)
...
Former [1997/11]Alexander, Thomas Bruce , et al
Boult, Wade & Tennant 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date96303449.115.05.1996
[1997/11]
Priority number, dateUS1995051197007.08.1995         Original published format: US 511970
[1997/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0761120
Date:12.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0761120
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:A45B25/14
[1997/11]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB [2000/03]
Former [1997/11]ES,  FR,  GB,  IT 
TitleGerman:Mehrfach faltbarer Automatikschirm mit vereinfachter Bedienung[1997/11]
English:Multiple-fold automatic umbrella with simplified control means[1997/11]
French:Parapluie à pliage multiple ayant un organ de commande simplifié[1997/11]
Examination procedure23.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/26]
05.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.1999Fee for grant paid
30.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE9215806U  (W.-W. WU) [X] 1 * figures 3,4,7,10-14 * [A] 2,4-8;
 [X]US5178174  (WU WOH-WEN [TW]) [X] 9 * figures 5-8 *;
 [A]US5232004  (WU WOH-WEN [TW]) [A] 9 * figures 2-6 *;
 [DPA]US5492140  (LIN CHUNG-KUANG [TW], et al) [DPA] 1,6-8 * column W *;
 [A]DE4120001  (TOTES INC [US]) [A] 3 * figures 5-7 *;
 [A]EP0498986  (FU TAI UMBRELLA WORKS LTD [TW])