Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0744850

EP0744850 - Digital network including early packet discard mechanism with adjustable threshold [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2003
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.10.2003  [2003/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Marconi Communications, Inc.
1000 Fore Drive Warrendale
Pennsylvania 15086 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/36]For all designated states
Marconi Communications, Inc.
1000 Fore Drive
Warrendale, Pennsylvania 15086 / US
Former [1996/48]For all designated states
FORE SYSTEMS, INC.
174 Thorn Hill Road
Warrendale, Pennsylvania 15086-7535 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Des Jardins, George Thomas
27 Doniport Road
Baden, Pennsylvania 15005 / US
02 / Sathaye, Shirish S.
415 Stag Horn Drive
Wexford, Pennsylvania 15090 / US
[1996/48]
Representative(s)O'Connell, David Christopher , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]O'Connell, David Christopher , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Former [2000/27]O'Connell, David Christopher , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co. Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Former [1996/48]Jones, Michael Raymond , et al
HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Application number, filing date96303586.021.05.1996
[1996/48]
Priority number, dateUS1995044567322.05.1995         Original published format: US 445673
[1996/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0744850
Date:27.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0744850
Date:19.05.1999
[1999/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0744850
Date:09.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56, H04Q11/04
[1996/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/48]
TitleGerman:Digitales Netzwerk mit frühem Paketablösungsmechanismus mit einstellbarem Schwellenwert[1996/48]
English:Digital network including early packet discard mechanism with adjustable threshold[1996/48]
French:Réseau digital comprenant un dispositif d'élimination prémature de paquets avec seuil ajustable[1996/48]
Examination procedure10.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
13.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2001Fee for grant paid
17.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0596200  (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH) [Y] 1-3,13,18,22,23,33,38 * column 1, line 1 - line 55 *;
 [Y]EP0647081  (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1-3,13,18,22,23,33,38 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 23; claims 1-3 *