Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0747982

EP0747982 - Cathodes for electrochemical cells having additives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 26.06.2002  [2002/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EVEREADY BATTERY COMPANY, INC.
Checkerboard Square St. Louis
Missouri 63164 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/52]For all designated states
EVEREADY BATTERY COMPANY, INC.
Checkerboard Square
St. Louis Missouri 63164 / US
Former [1996/50]For all designated states
EVEREADY BATTERY COMPANY
Checkerboard Square
St. Louis Missouri 63164 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Swierbut, Wendi M.
1535 Weymouth Circle No. 211
Westlake, Ohio 44145 / US
02 / Nardi, John C.
3398 Tyler Drive
Brunswick, Ohio 44212 / US
[1996/50]
Representative(s)Tubby, David George , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/52]Tubby, David George , et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Former [1996/50]Tubby, David George
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date96304263.507.06.1996
[1996/50]
Priority number, dateUS1995048542407.06.1995         Original published format: US 485424
[1996/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0747982
Date:11.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0747982
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/50, H01M4/62
[1996/50]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/50]
TitleGerman:Additvthaltige Kathoden für elektrochemische Zellen[1999/06]
English:Cathodes for electrochemical cells having additives[1996/50]
French:Cathodes contenant des additifs pour cellules électrochimiques[1996/50]
Former [1996/50]Additif enthaltende Kathoden für elektrochemische Zellen
Examination procedure09.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/23]
09.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.1999Fee for grant paid
23.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
[2002/26]
Former [2002/23]SE26.01.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]US4549943  (MELLORS GEOFFREY W [US]) [X] 1-3,11,16 * column 4, line 44 - line 59; claims 1,7 * * table I * * example 2; table II * * example 4; table IV *;
 [X]WO9217910  (BATTERY TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]) [X] 1-5,19 * page 7, paragraph L; claims 1,2 * * page 6, paragraph 4 *;
 [X]US3257242  (JOACHIM EULER, et al) [X] 1,3,4,19 * example 3 *;
 [X]DE2937285  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,19 * claim 9 *;
 [X]US4465747  (EVANS WILLIAM P [US]) [X] 1,3,4,13,14,18 * claims 1-3 *;
 [X]US4478921  (LANGAN RICHARD A [US]) [X] 1,3,4,13,14,18 * claim 4 *;
 [X]JPS5661771  ;
 [X]JPS56130082  ;
 [X]WO8501615  (ACR ELECTRONICS [US]) [X] 1,15 * claim 13 *;
 JPS61294768  [ ] (YAMAMOTO RYUICHI);
 [A]US5077150  (YONEDA TETSUYA [JP]) [A] 1,16 * claim 10 *;
 JPS62187118  [ ] (CHUO DENKI KOGYO CO);
 [A]FR1270318  (PERTRIX UNION GMBH) [A] 1 * claims 1,2B *;
 [PX]US5516604  (MIECZKOWSKA JOLA E [GB], et al) [PX] 1-5,11 * example 5; claims 1,4 * * column 6, line 6 - line 28; table 1 *;
 [PX]US5424145  (TOMANTSCHGER KLAUS [CA], et al) [PX] 1,15 * claims 1,3,18 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 81, no. 28, Database accession no. 81-50867D, XP002012847 & JPS5661771 A 19810527 (NIPPON ELECTRIC KK) [X] 1,11,19 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 81, no. 47, Database accession no. 81-86344D, XP002013459 & JPS56130082 A 19811012 (TOSHIBA DENCHI KK) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract *
    [] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820120), vol. 6, no. 9, Database accession no. (E - 090) [ ] * abstract *
 [X]  - YAMAMOTO, TAKAKAZU, "Secondary zinc-manganese oxide battery", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870601), vol. 106, no. 22, Database accession no. 179816, XP002013457 [X] 1,15 * abstract *
 [A]  - YAMAMURA, KAZUAKI ET AL, "Manufacture of manganese dioxide for batteries", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19871228), vol. 107, no. 26, Database accession no. 239778, XP002013458 [A] 1,15 * abstract *
 [A]  - XIA XI, "A STUDY ON THE RECHARGEABILITY OF MODIFIED MNO2", EXTENDED ABSTRACTS, (19930101), vol. 93/2, page 729, XP000422396 [A] 1 * column L, paragraph 1 * * column R, paragraph 2 *
ExaminationWO9625772
 WO9708770