Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0749743

EP0749743 - Magnetic door seal for infant incubator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.03.2002
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.05.2002  [2002/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Datex-Ohmeda, Inc.
3 Highwood Drive Tewsbury
Massachusetts 01876 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
Datex-Ohmeda, Inc.
3 Highwood Drive
Tewsbury, Massachusetts 01876 / US
Former [1999/37]For all designated states
Datex-Ohmeda, Inc.
3 Highwood Drive
Tewsbury, Massachusetts 01876 / US
Former [1996/52]For all designated states
OHMEDA INC.
110 Allen Road
Liberty Corner, New Jersey 07938-0804 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Simenauer, Robert M.
10204 Berkshire Lane
Ellicott City, Maryland 21042 / US
02 / Jones, Thomas C.
5329 Lightning View Road
Columbia, Maryland 21045 / US
[2000/45]
Former [1996/52]01 / Simenauer, Robert M.
10204 Berkshire Lane
Ellicott City, Maryland 21042 / US
02 / Jones, Thomas C.
5329 Lightening View Road
Columbia, Maryland 21045 / US
Representative(s)Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lancon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/28]Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew , et al
Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard
London EC4M 8SH / GB
Former [1996/52]Gough, Peter , et al
c/o THE BOC GROUP PLC Patent Department Chertsey Road
Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB
Application number, filing date96304303.907.06.1996
[1996/52]
Priority number, dateUS1995049268320.06.1995         Original published format: US 492683
[1996/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0749743
Date:27.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0749743
Date:26.03.1997
[1997/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0749743
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61G11/00, E06B7/20
[1996/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [1996/52]
TitleGerman:Magnetische Türdichtung für Säuglingsinkubator[1996/52]
English:Magnetic door seal for infant incubator[1996/52]
French:Jointure de porte magnétique pour couveuse[1996/52]
Examination procedure09.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/45]
28.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.07.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2001Fee for grant paid
14.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5308310  (ROFF TERENCE M [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 2; figures 1,2,7 * [Y] 4-10;
 [X]CA2079947  (BEN SIMHON HAIM [CA]) [X] 1 * page 8, line 4 - page 9, line 2; figure . *;
 [Y]GB2067077  (AIR SHIELDS) [Y] 4-10 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB2276409  (GONTAR ANTONI HAROLD NIKOLAS [GB]) [A] 8-10 * abstract *;
 [A]US3797172  (CANNON R) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *