Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0747571

EP0747571 - Downhole pressure pulse generator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.01.2001 [2001/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
P.O. Drawer 1431
Duncan
Oklahoma 73536 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
P.O. Drawer 1431
Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US
Former [1996/50]For all designated states
HALLIBURTON COMPANY
P.O. Box Drawer 1431
Duncan, Oklahoma 73536 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gardner, Wallace R.
15414 Camino Del Sol
Houston, Texas 77083 / US
02 / Chin, Wilson Chung-Lin
7703 Meadowbriar Lane
Houston, Texas 77063 / US
[1996/50]
Representative(s)Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London
WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/50]Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date96304307.007.06.1996
[1996/50]
Priority number, dateUS1995048373907.06.1995         Original published format: US 483739
[1996/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0747571
Date:11.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0747571
Date:05.11.1997
[1997/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0747571
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:E21B47/18
[1996/50]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB [1996/50]
TitleGerman:Imbohrloch-Druckpulsgenerator[1996/50]
English:Downhole pressure pulse generator[1996/50]
French:Générateur d'impulsion de pression de fond de puits[1996/50]
Examination procedure03.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/23]
06.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.1999Fee for grant paid
14.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DA]US4785300  (CHIN WILSON C [US], et al) [DA] 1,8,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4535429  (RUSSELL ANTHONY W [GB], et al) [A] 1,8,10 * abstract *