EP0785079 - Thermal transcription printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan 3-Dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do 441-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Moon-Bae 153-25 Maetan 1-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Neill, Alastair William, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | Neill, Alastair William, et al APPLEYARD LEES 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 96304713.9 | 26.06.1996 | [1997/30] | Priority number, date | KR19960000865 | 17.01.1996 Original published format: KR 9600865 | [1997/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0785079 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0785079 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/60 | [1997/30] | CPC: |
B41J3/60 (EP,US);
B41J11/02 (KR);
B41J2/325 (EP,US);
B41J11/0095 (KR);
B41J13/03 (KR);
B41J15/04 (KR);
B41J2/32 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/30] | Title | German: | Thermotransferdrucker | [1997/30] | English: | Thermal transcription printer | [1997/30] | French: | Imprimante à transfert thermique | [1997/30] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 29.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4453841 (BOBICK THOMAS W [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7 * column 4, line 51 - column 8, line 34; figures 1-5B *; | [Y]US4844770 (SHIRAISHI MIKIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,5-7 * column 2, line 14 - line 49 * * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 29 * * column 7, line 22 - column 8, line 17; figures 2-7 *; | [YA]US4932798 (KARDINAL HANS-JOACHIM [DE], et al) [Y] 1,5-7 * column 3, line 44 - column 6, line 45; figures 1-7 * [A] 2,3; | [A]US5101222 (HAKKAKU KUNIO [JP]) [A] 1-3,5-7 * column 6, line 6 - column 8, line 58; figure 1 *; | [A]US5452959 (OKA YASUO [JP]) [A] 1,4-6* column 4, line 7 - column 7, line 42; figures 1-5 * |